Norita v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety et al

Plaintiff: Vincent San Nicolas Norita
Defendant: Carlo Evangelista, Stanley Patris, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety and Executive Director Robert A. Guerrero
Case Number: 1:2018cv00022
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(B)(1),and the CNMI Department of Public Safety Pursuant to Rules 17 and 12(B) (6) filed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. (Holmes, Rene)
September 19, 2018 Reset Hearing: re #11 Order Extending Deadline. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 has been rescheduled to 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Extending Deadline re: #10 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/19/2018. (FPA)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATED Motion To Extend Time by Vincent San Nicolas Norita Rene Cherise Holmes appearing for Plaintiff Vincent San Nicolas Norita (Holmes, Rene)
September 7, 2018 Set Hearing: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(B)(1),and the CNMI Department of Public Safety Pursuant to Rules 17 and 12(B) (6). Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro 12(B)(1),and the CNMI Department of Public Safety Pursuant to Rules 17 and 12(B) (6). Hessel E. Yntema IV appearing for Defendants Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety, Carlo Evangelista, Robert A. Guerrero, Stanley Patris (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Yntema IV, Hessel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Stanley Patris Certification of Scope of Employment of Carlo Evangelista and Notice of Substitution (Yntema IV, Hessel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Carlo Evangelista Certification of Employment of Carlo Evangelista and Notice of Substitution (Yntema IV, Hessel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hessel E. Yntema IV on behalf of All Defendants (Yntema IV, Hessel)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. Carlo Evangelista served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Holmes, Rene)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. Stanley Patris served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Holmes, Rene)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. Robert A. Guerrero served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Holmes, Rene)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Holmes, Rene)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Carlo Evangelista. (BTC)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Stanley Patris. (BTC)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Robert A. Guerrero. (BTC)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety. (BTC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety, Carlo Evangelista, Robert A. Guerrero, Stanley Patris (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5139.), filed by Vincent San Nicolas Norita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norita v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlo Evangelista
Represented By: Hessel E. Yntema IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Patris
Represented By: Hessel E. Yntema IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Hessel E. Yntema IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director Robert A. Guerrero
Represented By: Hessel E. Yntema IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent San Nicolas Norita
Represented By: Rene Cherise Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?