Naraja v. Bank of Hawaii
Plaintiff: Frances DLG Naraja
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bank of Hawaii
3Rd Party Defendant: Gloria DLG Sablan, The Lorenzo I. Deleon Guerrero Family Trust and The Commonwealth Development Authority
Case Number: 1:2018cv00023
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of Hawaii. Gloria DLG Sablan served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Frink, Sean)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Self Recusal and Notice of Magistrate Judge's Availability. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/5/2018. (DPB)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 The Bank of Hawaii's: (1) ANSWER To Frances DLG Naraja's #1 Complaint; (2) COUNTERCLAIM (3) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Against Frances DLG Naraja, Gloria DLG Sablan, The Commonwealth Development Authority, and the Lorenzo I. Deleon Guerrero Family Trust; & (4) JURY TRIAL DEMAND against The Lorenzo I. Deleon Guerrero Family Trust, Gloria DLG Sablan, The Commonwealth Development Authority, filed by Bank of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B) (Frink, Sean)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Bank of Hawaii re #1 Notice of Removal. (Frink, Sean)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Superior Court of the Northern Mariana Islands Case No. 18-0291-CV (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5143.) filed by Bank of Hawaii. (BTC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naraja v. Bank of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bank of Hawaii
Represented By: Marcia K. Schultz
Represented By: Catherine J. Cachero
Represented By: Sean E. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances DLG Naraja
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gloria DLG Sablan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Lorenzo I. Deleon Guerrero Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Commonwealth Development Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?