Yen et al v. Gulick et al
Plaintiff: Chien-Li Yen and Alicia Yen
Defendant: David Gulick, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv00024
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Defendants' Motion for 30-Day Extension to File Answer to Complaint for Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/15/2018. (FPA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's UNOPPOSED MOTION for 30-Day Extension to File Response to Complaint for Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory and Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint (Wessling, Jessica)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica F. Wessling on behalf of All Defendants (Wessling, Jessica)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Proof of Service - K Nielsen. Served upon All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - LF Cissna, #2 Proof of Service - D Gulick) (Horey, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to David Gulick. (BTC)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen. (BTC)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna. (BTC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, David Gulick, Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5179.) filed by Alicia Yen, Chien-Li Yen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yen et al v. Gulick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gulick
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chien-Li Yen
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Yen
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?