Loh v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Plaintiff: Shirline Loh
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00025
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Kelley Butcher appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Butcher, Kelley)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Second Stipulation Requesting Extensions of Time for Defendant's Answer to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/01/2018. (FPA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Kelley Butcher appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Butcher, Kelley)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Stipulation to Extend Time For Defendant's Answer to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/09/2018. (DPB)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant's Answer to Complaint Kelley Butcher appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Butcher, Kelley)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by Shirline Loh . Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Fitzgerald, William)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (BTC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5180.), filed by Shirline Loh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loh v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirline Loh
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Kelley Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?