Yu v. Attao

Petitioner: Qun Yu and Yu Qun
Respondent: Vincent S. Attao
Case Number: 1:2018cv00028
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #4 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Clerk's Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Postage) (BTC)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Heather L. Kennedy on 01/07/2019. (BTC)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Designated Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 01/03/2019. (BTC)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #2 Order of Recusal and Reassignment. (FPA)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL and Reassignment. Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona recused. Case reassigned to Designated Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/21/2018. (FPA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Qun Yu. (Attachments: #1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, #2 Motion to Disqualify or Recuse Yourself and Reassignment, #3 Notice of Motions, #4 Motion of Request to Exceeded More Pages in Memorandum of Law, #5 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, #6 Declaration in Support of Petitioner's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, #7 Memorandum of Law, #8 Evidence of Record (E.R.) Appendix) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. Attao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Qun Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yu Qun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vincent S. Attao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?