Kingto v. PTI Pacifica Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry T. Kingto
Defendant: Shirley Dotts, Julian Coopernurse, PTI Pacifica Inc., Theresa Taimanglo, Cris Baluyut and Hans Mickelson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00029
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER #4 Allowing Defendant Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/19/2018. (FPA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by PTI Pacifica Inc. Sean E. Frink appearing for Defendant PTI Pacifica Inc. (Frink, Sean)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to PTI Pacifica Inc. dba IT&E (BTC)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Terry T. Kingto re #2 Amended Complaint, AMENDED SUMMONS Erroneously Filed (Nutting, Stephen) Modified on 12/7/2018 (DPB).
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against PTI Pacifica Inc., filed by Terry T. Kingto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue Ltr, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- EEOC Charge Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Response IT&E, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Response Kingto) (Nutting, Stephen)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Julian Coopernurse. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Cris Baluyut. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Hans Mickelson. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Theresa Taimanglo. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Shirley Dotts. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to PTI Pacifica Inc. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Violations of Americans with Disabilities Act, The Age Discrimination in Employmebt Act, and Wrongful Termination filed by Terry T. Kingto.(Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100005267) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (FPA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingto v. PTI Pacifica Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Dotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Coopernurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Pacifica Inc.
Represented By: Sean E. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Taimanglo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cris Baluyut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry T. Kingto
Represented By: Jose Silvestre Palacios Mafnas, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen J. Nutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?