Kalarikkal v. World Corporation

Plaintiff: Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal
Defendant: World Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference is set for 4/22/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 03/12/2019 (BTC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re: #3 Complaint filed by Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal. (Kosack, Rexford)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. World Corporation served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (FPA)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against World Corporation, filed by Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)
February 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to World Corporation. (BTC)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCREENING ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re: #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 02/19/2019. (BTC)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal. (Attachments: #1 Draft Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalarikkal v. World Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sathiyapalan Kalarikkal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Corporation
Represented By: Rexford C. Kosack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?