Rupkalwis v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Joerg Rupkalwis
Defendant: Joseph M. Young, William F. Hagerty, IV and United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Order or Judgment re #2 Order Dismissing Pro Se Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Heather L. Kennedy on 06/19/2019. (FPA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #2 Order Dismissing Pro Se Complaint with Prejudice. Served upon Joerg Rupkalwis. (ADE)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Dismissing Pro Se Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/18/2019. (ADE)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying fees or Costs filed by Joerg Rupkalwis. (Attachments: #1 Draft Complaint) (ADE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2019: #2 Letter to Clerk - received 4/12/2019) (ADE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupkalwis v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Hagerty, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joerg Rupkalwis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?