Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd et al v. Black Bison Travel Corp et al
Plaintiff: Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd and JunJie Wu
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, Jili Corp and Black Bison Travel Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANTS' Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.55(c). William M. Fitzgerald appearing for Defendants Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp (Fitzgerald, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and In Support of Defendants' Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.55(c) to Allow It's Answer to be Filed by Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION) (Fitzgerald, William)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER #8 Extending the Time to File a Response to the #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/12/2019. (ADE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION filed by Jili Corp, Black Bison Travel Corp re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Order to Show Cause . (Fitzgerald, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANTS' Motion for an Order Extending the Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Order to Show Cause William M. Fitzgerald appearing for Defendants Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp (Fitzgerald, William)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER To Show Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/09/2019. (ADE)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by JunJie Wu, Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd. (Fitzgerald, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION filed by Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd, JunJie Wu re #4 MOTION for Entry of Default . (Thompson, Colin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiffs Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd, JunJie Wu (Thompson, Colin)
July 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd, JunJie Wu . Served upon Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp (Thompson, Colin)
July 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd, JunJie Wu . Served upon Black Bison Travel Corp, Jili Corp (Thompson, Colin)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Black Bison Travel Corp. (BTC)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jili Corp. (BTC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Bison Travel Corp, Does 1 - 10, Jili Corp (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5588.), filed by Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd, JunJie Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd et al v. Black Bison Travel Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jili Corp
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Bison Travel Corp
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimeng Science & Technology Co. Ltd
Represented By: Colin M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JunJie Wu
Represented By: Colin M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?