Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC v. Commonwealth Casino Commission
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Defendant: Commonwealth Casino Commission and Edward C DeLeon Guerrero
Intervenor Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC and Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Motions terminated: #34 #35 Motion to Remand #46 Motion to Dismiss. (FPA)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of Dismissal #52 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/03/2019. (FPA)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER of United States Court of Appeals re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Dismiss by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's #46 Motion to Dismiss CounterClaim filed by Commonwealth Casino Commission. (Ernest, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER of United States Court of Appeals re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (FPA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY Memorandum to Defendant's #48 Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip)
August 19, 2019 Filing 48 OPPOSITION to #34 Motion to Remand filed by Commonwealth Casino Commission, Edward C DeLeon Guerrero. (Petersburg, Benjamin)
August 19, 2019 Set Hearing: Motion Hearing on #46 Motion to Dismiss Counter Claim is set for 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support of #46 Motion to Dismiss filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip)
August 15, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE and MOTION to Dismiss #2 Cross Counterclaim Phillip J. Tydingco appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip)
August 12, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of #34 Remand Request and Submission to Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs In-Intervention Grand Marianas, LLC and Imperial Pacific Properties . (Huesman, Braddock)
August 12, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/01/2019 Closing Arguments before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: J&J Court Transcribers, Inc. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (ADE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 07/30/2019 Witness Testimony before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: J&J Court Transcribers, Inc. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (ADE)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER of United States Court of Appeals re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED Notice of Appeal Preliminary Injunction Appeal by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC re #39 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appendix Doc 37 - Decision and Order Denying Petition for Preliminary Injunction) (Tydingco, Phillip)
August 7, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC for proceedings held on 07/30/2019 and 08/01/2019 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #37 Decision and Order Denying Petition for Preliminary Injunction by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number MPX100005613. (ADE)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #26 Second Stipulation on Briefing Schedule on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/06/2019. (ADE)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECISION AND ORDER Denying Petition for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/06/2019. (ADE) (Main Document 37 replaced on 8/06/2019) (ADE)
August 6, 2019 Set Hearing: #34 Motion to Remand Hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Law and Authorities in Support of the #35 Motion for Remand .(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Casino License Agreement) (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
August 5, 2019 Filing 35 Plaintiff's NOTICE and MOTION for Remand Ellsbeth Viola Alepuyo appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
August 5, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand Braddock J. Huesman appearing for Intervenor Plaintiffs Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC (Huesman, Braddock)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order to August 8, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/02/2019. (FPA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Closing Arguments for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit and Witness List). (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 7/30/2019. Hearing continued to 8/1/2019 01:00 PM for closing arguments in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit and Witness List). (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Errata Response to the Court's July 26, 2019 Order by Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC (Gregory, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Allowing Late Filing and Accepting Errata re #24 Motion for Leave to File Late Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/30/2019. (FPA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL Disclosures by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment 1 - Supplemental Great Falls Tribune, #2 Appendix Attachment 2 - Supplemental Stokwitz, #3 Appendix Attachment 3 - Declaration of Viola Alepuyo) (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 29, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 09 and 10, 2019 of David Berger's Testimony at the Superior Court of the Northern Mariana Islands before Judge Kenneth L. Govendo. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 Second STIPULATION on #19 Briefing Schedule On the Motion to Remand . (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #20 Notice Regarding Availability of Witness and Request for Witness Testimony Via Video Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/29/2019. (BTC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Late Memorandum in Response to the Court's July 26, 2019 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Declaration Brandon Benson, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2 - IPI's Response to the Court's July 26, 2019 Order) (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's RESPONSE to the Court's July 26, 2019 #18 Order. (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to the Court's July 26, 2019 #18 Order and MOTION to Remand. Matthew T Gregory appearing for Intervenor Plaintiffs Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC. (Gregory, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF on Pullman Abstention and Supplemental Jurisdiction by Commonwealth Casino Commission, Edward C DeLeon Guerrero. (Petersburg, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Regarding Availability of Witness and Request for Witness Testimony via Video Conference (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION RE: Briefing Schedule On the Motion to Remand by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Ellsbeth Viola Alepuyo appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 7/26/2019. (ADE)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order #5 Plaintiff's Notice and Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order Issued by the Commonwealth Superior Court. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/25/2019. (BTC)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: #5 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 7/25/2019 . Motion hearing for Preliminary Injunction is set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (FPA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Opposition to Motion, filed by Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC. (Huesman, Braddock)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to Plaintiff-Intervenors' Complaint in Intervention by Commonwealth Casino Commission (Petersburg, Benjamin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Defendant's #9 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Extending TRO) (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by Commonwealth Casino Commission re #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Petersburg, Benjamin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dec. BJH, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A) (Huesman, Braddock)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Braddock J. Huesman on behalf of Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC (Huesman, Braddock)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION to Motion re #5 MOTION Plaintiff's Notice and Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order Issued by the Commonwealth Superior Court filed by Commonwealth Casino Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Noreta V. Pamintuan) (Petersburg, Benjamin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Gregory on behalf of Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC (Gregory, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Set Hearing: re #5 Notice and Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing is set for 7/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/25/2019. (FPA)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Viola Alepuyo in Support of #4 Motion to Shorten Time To Be Heard #5 Motion to Extend the TRO . (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's NOTICE and MOTION to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order Issued by the Commonwealth Superior Court. Ellsbeth Viola Alepuyo appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's NOTICE and MOTION to Shorten Time To Be Heard . (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Extend TRO . (Alepuyo, Ellsbeth Viola)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition for Injunctive Relief and Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Counterclaim re: #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons) Erroneously Filed. (Petersburg, Benjamin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Commonwealth Superior Court Case No. 19-0202-cv (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5592.), filed by Commonwealth Casino Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2019 to add Table of Contents to Exhibit) (FPA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC v. Commonwealth Casino Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Tydingco
Represented By: Ellsbeth Viola Alepuyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Casino Commission
Represented By: Benjamin K. Petersburg
Represented By: Michael L. Ernest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C DeLeon Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC
Represented By: Braddock J. Huesman
Represented By: Matthew T Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Grand Marianas (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Braddock J. Huesman
Represented By: Matthew T Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?