Pangelinan v. United States of America
Petitioner: John Gerald Castro Pangelinan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00015
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Hearing held on 01/17/2020 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona, re Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: HMW. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER (BTC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan for proceedings held on 01/17/2020 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Horey, Joseph)
May 20, 2020 Filing 29 CLERK'S Notice of Receipt of Letter. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (BTC)
April 24, 2020 Notice of Appeal received by Ninth Circuit on 04/24/2020 - Appeals No. 20-15783.(DPB)
April 24, 2020 Notice of Appeal emailed to the Court of Appeals. (BTC)
April 21, 2020 Terminate #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ADE)
April 21, 2020 #27 Notice of Appeal re #23 Decision and Order Denying Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Sentence filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (BTC)
April 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appeal re #26 Decision and Order Denying Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Sentence filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan (Horey, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST for an Extension to Appeal by Petitioner John Gerald Castro Pangelinan (BTC)
April 20, 2020 [ECF.27] DENIED as Moot by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #25 Petitioner A Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/16/2020. (ADE)
April 16, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Issuance of Certificate of Appealability. Joseph E. Horey appearing for Petitioner John Gerald Castro Pangelinan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing) (Horey, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Order or Judgment re #23 Decision and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy on 4/13/2020. (ADE)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECISION AND ORDER Denying Petitioner's #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/10/2020. (ADE)
April 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE to the Court filed by United States of America re United States v. Dominguez (9th Cir. April 7, 2020) (Backe, Garth)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (Horey, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 United States' RESPONSE to #19 Petitioner's Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by United States of America. (Backe, Garth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (Horey, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 Petitioner's REPLY to #10 Government's Response filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (ADE)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying #16 Motion for Extension Time As Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 1/21/2020. (ADE)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for An Extension of Time to File Reply to #10 Government's Response filed by Petitioner John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (ADE)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 1/17/2020. Motion Hearing is set for 4/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CJA 20: Appointment Order of Attorney David G. Banes for John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/08/2020. (FPA)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Mailing of #12 Order Appointing Attorney and Setting Status Conference mailed and faxed to Federal Correctional Complex, USP Coleman II. (FPA)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Appointing Attorney and Setting Status Conference. Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 8:00 AM Chamorro Standard Time in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 1/6/2020. (ADE)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from John Gerald Castro Pangelinan to Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona dated on 12/19/2019. (ADE)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 United States' RESPONSE to Petitioner's #1 Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case - United States v. Edwards, #2 Unpublished Case - Higa v. United States) (Backe, Garth)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #4 ORDER Directing Government to Respond and #8 ORDER Granting Government's Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Served upon John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (DPB)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Government's Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/29/2019. (DPB)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 United States' AMEMDED MOTION for Extension of Time. Garth R. Backe appearing for Respondent United States of America (Backe, Garth)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth R. Backe on behalf of United States of America (Backe, Garth)
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 United States' MOTION for Extension of Time. Garth R. Backe appearing for Respondent United States of America (Backe, Garth)
November 29, 2019 Terminate #5 Motion for Extension of Time. (DPB)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Government to Respond. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/26/2019. (ADE)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 USCA Order (Attachments: #1 2255 Application) (BTC)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Referring #1 Section 2255 Application to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/15/2019. (ADE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody filed by John Gerald Castro Pangelinan. (Attachments: #1 Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 28 U.S.C. 2255 by a Person in Federal Custody, #2 Envelope) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangelinan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Gerald Castro Pangelinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?