Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-5 and Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00016
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 DECLARATION filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC re #264 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 37(b) on Shortened Time . (Thompson, Colin)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC in support of #264 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 37(b) on Shortened Time . (Thompson, Colin)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 37(b) on Shortened Time Colin M. Thompson appearing for Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson Supporting Attorney's Fees Awarded by Court Order on February 26, 2021 filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER Adopting #255 Adopting Report and Recommendation and Granting #240 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; and Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/23/2021 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/26/2021. (ADE)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference and Hearing on #258 Motion to Compel held on 2/26/2021. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/23/2021 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminate #255 Report and Recommendations. (FPA)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminate #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney George L. Hasselback terminated. (FPA)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminate #258 Motion to Compel. (FPA)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: #258 Motion to Compel Discovery on Shorten Time. Motion to Compel Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 DECLARATION of Counsel in Support of #258 Motion to Compel toDiscovery on Shortened Time filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC . (Thompson, Colin)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #258 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel to Discovery on Shortened Time filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC . (Thompson, Colin)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Motion and Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery on Shortened Time. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Telephonic Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Telephonic Conference held on 2/23/2021. Attorney Colin Thompson appeared on behalf of Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. and Attorney George Hasselback appeared on behalf of Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. Counsel apprised Court of IPI's non-appearance at a deposition. Attorney Thompson gave notice that he was going to file a motion to compel and will notice it for Friday, Feb 26. 2021 @ 1:30 p.m., with no opposition from Defendant and with permission from the Court. (Court Reporter n/a) (FPA)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Granting #256 Stipulated Request for Continuance. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/16/2021. (ADE)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATED Request for Continuance filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, Counter Claimant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Hasselback, George)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #240 MOTION to Withdraw. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy on 02/12/2021. (TVW)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy: Hearing on #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney held on 2/11/2021. Status Conference is set for 2/26/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 DECLARATION of Counsel in Support of #252 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims in filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC . (Thompson, Colin)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to #247 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Hearing on #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is now set before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy on 2/11/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom. (FPA)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy: In Chambers Conference held on 2/9/2021. Attorney George Hasselback appeared on behalf of Defendant IPI. The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney hearing set for 2/11/2021 at 1:30 p.m. will be before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. (Court Reporter n/a) (FPA)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference and Hearing on #241 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and #247 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims held on 2/4/2021. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminate #241 Motion for Extension of Time. (FPA)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's #241 Motion for Extension of Time under Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Granting Request to be Heard on Shortened Time. Hearing on #241 Motion for Extension of Time for Amendment of Pleadings is set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/28/2021. (DPB)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 1/28/2021. Status Conference and Hearing on #241 Motion for Extension of Time is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona.Manglona. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. George L. Hasselback appearing for Counter Claimant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit) (Hasselback, George)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 AFFIDAVIT filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC . (Hasselback, George)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 DECLARATION of Service. Served upon Tsung-Lun Tsai on 1/19/2021 filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 DECLARATION of Service. Served upon Eric Poon on 1/19/2021 filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Plaintiff's NON-OPPOSITION to George Hasselback's #240 Motion to Withdraw filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Extension of Time under Local Rule 7.1(f) and Request to be Heard on Shortened Time. George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hasselback, George)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Hearing on #240 Motion to Withdraw is set for 2/11/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hasselback, George)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/22/2020 - Motion Hearing held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER (DPB )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/2020 - Motion Hearing held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER (DPB )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/5/2020 - Hearing on Motion to Continue Probable Cause held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER (DPB)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #218 #220 Motions for Turnover and Fifth #181 , Sixth #190 , Seventh #192 Writ Applications. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/6/2020. (ADE)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER #233 Establishing Security Pending Appeal. (FPA)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Establishing Security Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/05/2020. (FPA)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibit In Support of Motion to Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3) (Dotts, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION for an Order Establishing Security Pending Appeal by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Status Conference set for 11/5/2020 has been vacated. (ADE)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/2/2020 - Motion Hearing held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: HWD. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (FPA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 INITIAL Disclosures by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 is now a Status Conference and is reset to 11/5/2020 at 2:30 PM in 2nd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #218 #220 Motion for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale and #225 Motion to Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment held on 10/22/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 9:00 AM in 2nd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HWD) (FPA)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #225 Motion to Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment. (FPA)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY to Defendant's #225 Opposition to Writs to Execution Vehicles, Heavy Equipment, and Gaming Equipment and Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2021. Status Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Fact Discovery Cutoff due by 5/25/2021. Fact Discovery Motions Filing due by 6/8/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure due by 7/6/2021. Defendants Expert Disclosure due by 7/6/2021. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline due by 8/3/2021. Expert Discovery Cutoff and Expert Discovery Motions Filing Deadline due by 8/10/2021. Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline due by 8/10/2021. Daubert-type Motions Filing Deadline due by 8/24/2021. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 9:00 AM in Chambers Conference Room before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Filing Deadline due by 10/2/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Bench Trial set for 10/19/2021 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/20/2020. (ADE)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Granting #222 #226 Motions to Shorten Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/19/2020. (ADE)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION To Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F) Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F), #2 Declaration Of Michael W. Dotts Re Certification Of Meet And Confer Obligation Under Local Rule 7.1 (F)) (Dotts, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MOTION To Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Combined Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Approve Deposit To Secure Judgment and In Opposition to Writs to Auction Vehicles, Heavy Equipment, and Gaming Equipment, #2 Declaration of Donald Browne In Support of Motion to Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment and Opposition to Writs To Auction Vehicles, Heavy Equipment, and Gaming Equipment, #3 Declaration of Wenqiang Zou In Support of Motion for Reconsideration to Allow for Establishment of Restricted Bank Account, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration Of Wenqiang Zou In Support of Motion for Reconsideration To Allow for Establishment Of Restricted Bank Account, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Wenqiang Zou In Support of Motion for Reconsideration to Allow for Establishment of Restricted Bank Account) (Dotts, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: re #218 Motion for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Gaming Machines, #220 Motion for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Heavy Equipment and Vehicles, #225 Motion To Approve Deposit to Secure Judgment. Motions Hearing set for 10/22/2020 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Defendant's BRIEF Supporting Objection to #214 the Casino Cage Writ of Execution filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Nguyen In Support of Objection To Application For Writ of Execution On Cage Funds, #2 Exhibit 1 - to Alex Nguyen Declaration In Support of Objection To Application For Writ of Execution On Cage Funds, #3 Exhibit 2- to Alex Nguyen Declaration In Support of Objection To Application For Writ of Execution On Cage Funds) (Dotts, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of #222 Unopposed Motion to Shorten Time under Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Colin M. Thompson appearing for Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 DECLARATION of COunsel in Support of #220 Motion for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Heavy Equipment and Vehciles filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Heavy Equipment and Vehicles. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 DECLARATION of Counsel in Support of #218 Motion for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Casino Gaming Machines filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION for Turnover, Assignment, and Judicial Sale of Certain of Judgment Debtor's Casino Gaming Machines. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM DECISION Granting #160 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss IPI's Counterclaims, and Denying Defendant's #184 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/15/2020. (ADE)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2020. (Court Reporter HWD) (FPA)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROPOSED Scheduling Order filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Plaintiff's BRIEF on the Casino Cage Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CASE Management Conference Statement by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Granting #211 Stipulation for Briefing Re: IPI Casino Cage Writ of Execution. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/07/2020. (FPA)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION for Briefing Re: IPI Casino Cage Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing taken off calendar. Motion hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 9:00am is vacated. (DPB)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting #209 Stipulation of Settlement between the CNMI Government and Pacific Rim. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/17/2020. (DPB)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION for Settlement Between the CNMI Government and Pacific Rim filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin) (Main Document 209 replaced on 9/17/2020) (ADE).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting #207 Second Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/15/2020. (FPA)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 is rescheduled to 10/29/2020 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SECOND STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference is set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona.Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/10/2020. (DPB)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearings on #160 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and #184 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims held on 9/10/2020. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #160 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and #184 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. (FPA)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting #201 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/01/2020. (FPA)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC for proceedings held on July 23, 2020 before Judge Honorable Judge Ramona V. Manglona.. (Thompson, Colin)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC for proceedings held on July 15, 2020 before Judge Honorable Judge Ramona V. Manglona.. (Thompson, Colin)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Motion Regarding Priority of Tax Lien set for 10/08/2020 is rescheduled to 10/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY to #187 Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Hasselback, George)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC for proceedings held on 07/23/2020 before Judge Hon. Ramona V. Manglona.. (Dotts, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC for proceedings held on 07/15/2020 before Judge Hon. Ramona V. Manglona.. (Dotts, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on Application for Writ of Execution held on 8/25/2020. Motion Regarding Priority of tax Lien set for 10/8/2020 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Tax Lien in Favor of the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Island filed by CNMI Department of Finance, Division of Revenue and Taxation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rollins, Dustin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 LIMITED ENTRY of Appearance filed by Dustin Rollins on behalf of CNMI Department of Finance, Division of Revenue and Taxation Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Rollins, Dustin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees for Motion for Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 8/25/2020. (DPB)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson Supporting #192 Application for Writ of Execution for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Gaming Machines or for Order in Aid of Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Gaming Machines or for Order in Aid of Judgment filed Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson Supporting #190 Application for Writ of Execution for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Vehicles or for Order in Aid of Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Vehicles or for Order in Aid of Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Allowing for #188 Additional Time to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 8/19/2020. (ADE)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATED MOTION for Additional Time to File Reply filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Hasselback, George) M
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: re #181 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 03:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ACH)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to Defendant's #184 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REQUEST to Schedule Hearing. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendants Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson Regarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Hearing on #184 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims is set for 9/10/2020 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of support, #2 Declaration of Counsel) (Hasselback, George)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPLY in Support of Plaintiff's #160 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OBJECTION to Application for Writ of Execution filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC re #181 Application for Writ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Objection to Application for Writ of Execution) (Dotts, Michael)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Court will take Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims #160 on Briefs, No Opposition Have Been Filed. Hearing Set for 8/7/2020 at 1:30 PM is Vacated. (ADE)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order On July 27, 2020 at 2:20 PM, a telephone conference was held by Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. At the request of parties to resolve dispute, Court ordered that the inspection is not limited to counsel only. Party representatives my attend inspection. (BTC)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Striking IPI'S Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/23/2020. (BTC)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SUA SPONTE ORDER Authorizing Release of Funds to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/23/2020. (BTC)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearings on #159 Motion for Order in Aid of Judgment and #172 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) held on 7/23/2020 (Court Reporter HMW) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit and Witness List) (FPA)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Hearing on #172 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) is set for 7/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #159 Motion for Order in Aid of Judgment and #172 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6). (FPA)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Court Granted #175 Motion for Order to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). (FPA)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS against Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Hasselback, George) Stricken pursuant to Court Order #180 . (BTC)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of #175 Motion for Order to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Order to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Witness filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #172 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Motion and Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #164 Motion For Order Authorizing Release of Funds to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/15/2020. (DPB)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 7/15/2020. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/23/2020 is reset to 8/7/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 154 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Deposition for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by George L. Hasselback on behalf of Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Hasselback, George)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 LETTER from First Hawaiian Bank (DPB)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/8/2020. Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Telephonic Conference set for 7/8/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of #164 Motion for Order Authorizing Release of Funds to Plaintiff filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Order Authorizing Release of Funds to Plaintiff. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Denying #157 Fourth Application for Writ of Execution #154 Third Application for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/02/2020. (BTC)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing #159 Motion for Order in Aid of Judgment by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC for proceedings held on 04/02/2020 before Judge Hon. Ramona V. Manglona.. (Dotts, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Related Case. (DPB)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #160 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2020 (Thompson, Colin)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: #160 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's MOTION for Order in Aid of Judgment. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's #157 Fourth Application for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 FOURTH APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OBJECTIONS to #154 Third Application for Writ of Execution filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Dotts, Michael)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's #154 Third Application for Writ Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 THIRD APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Security Title, Inc. served upon United States Marshal. (ADE)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Pacific American Title, Inc. served upon United States Marshal. (ADE)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SECOND Notice of Writ of Execution re #150 Second Order for Issuance of Writs of Execution. (BTC)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to Security Title, Inc. (BTC)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to Pacific American Title, Inc. (BTC)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SECOND ORDER for Issuance of Writs of Execution re #148 Application for Writ of Execution. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/10/2010. (ADE)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's #148 Second Application for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SECOND APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 WRIT of Execution as to First Hawaiian Bank served upon United States Marshal. (BTC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 WRIT of Execution as to City Trust Bank served upon United States Marshal. (BTC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 WRIT of Execution as to Bank of Saipan served upon United States Marshal. (BTC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 WRIT of Execution as to Bank of Guam served upon United States Marshal. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE Of Writ of Execution. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER for Issuance of Writ of Execution re #129 Application for Writ of Execution. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 06/08/2020. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to Bank of Saipan. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to Bank of Guam. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to First Hawaiian Bank. (BTC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order WRIT of Execution issued as to City Trust Bank (BTC)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #140 Motion for File Out-of-Time or In the Alternative Strike Filing from the Record. (ADE)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Denying #123 Defendant's Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/4/2020. (ADE)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE and MOTION to File Out-of-Time or In the Alternative Strike Filing from the Record filed by Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to File Out-of-Time or In the Alternative Strike Filing from the Record, #2 Declaration of Andrew Brendon Ojeda In Support of Motion to File Out-of-Time or In the Alternative Strike Filing from the Record, #3 Declaration of Michael W. Dotts In Support of Motion to File Out-of-Time or In the Alternative Strike Filing from the Record) (Dotts, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Defendant's REPLY to #136 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Dotts, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion for Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 06/03/2020. (FPA)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #133 Amended Clerk's Judgment filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (ADE)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #123 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Dotts, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 USCA Time Schedule Order and Letter as to #121 Notice of Appeal filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal received by Ninth Circuit on [05/21/2020] - Appeals No. [20-16047] (ADE)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Pacific Rim Development, LLC against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court Heather L. Kennedy on 5/28/2020. (ADE)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #131 IPI'S Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/27/2020. (BTC)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE and MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F). Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F), #2 Declaration of Michael W. Dotts In Support of Motion to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F), #3 Declaration of Redie Dela Cruz In Support of Motion to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(F), #4 Certification of Movants Efforts to Resolve the Dispute Without Court Action Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(F)(3)(E) and Compliance with Local Rule 7.1(F)(4)(B)) (Dotts, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's #129 Application for Writ Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: re #132 Order on Motion to Shorten Time. Motion Hearing set for 06/25/2020 is reset to 6/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting Rule 54(D) Motion and Amending Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/26/2020. (BTC)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying #124 Motion Shorten of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 5/26/2020. (ADE)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: #123 Motion to Stay. Motion to Stay Hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for a Stay. Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Dotts, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Extending Time to File Response to Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Counterclaims. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/22/2020. (BTC)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal. Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis Mafnas in Support of: Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal; Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time, #2 Declaration of Redie De La Cruz in Support of: Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal; Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time) (Dotts, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Motion and Defendant's MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal. Michael Wilfred Dotts appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal, #2 Declaration of Francis Mafnas in Support of: Defendants Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal; Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time, #3 Declaration of Redie De La Cruz in Support of: Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal; Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time, #4 Declaration of Michael W. Dotts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal) (Dotts, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 5/22/2020. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #113 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (FPA)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #105 Decision and Order filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00, Fee Paid. (Attachments: #1 Decision and Order (ECF 105)) (ADE)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SURREPLY Re: #116 Interest and Fees filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celina Viloria, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration) (Horey, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SECOND DECLARATION of Lee H. Vensel regarding Fees and Interests filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC re #116 Reply to Response to Motion (Thompson, Colin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SECOND DECLARATION of Evangeline Bermeo regarding Fees and Interests filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC re #116 Reply to Response to Motion (Thompson, Colin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SECOND DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson regarding Attorney's Fees filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC re #116 Reply to Response to Motion (Thompson, Colin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY Re: #112 Attorney's Fees and Interest to be Added to Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #113 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel held on 5/15/2020. Status Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to #113 O'Connor Berman Horey & Banes, LLC's Motion for Withdrawal filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Conference call instructions to be emailed to the parties. (FPA)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/7/2020. Attorney Colin Thompson appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorneys Joseph Horey and Cong Nie appeared on behalf of the Defendant. All parties appeared telephonically. Court addressed Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Plaintiff's opposition to be filed on May 14, 2020 by 3:00 p.m. Parties are to meet and confer to negotiate attorneys' fees and interest. If the parties cannot reach a resolution, Plaintiff shall file a reply to Defendant's objections no later than May 14, 2020 and Defendant's shall file a sur-reply to be filed no later than May 21, 2020. Hearing on #113 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is set for 5/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter n/a) (FPA)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 O'Connor Berman Horey & Banes, LLC's NOTICE of Motion and MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Cong Nie appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Nie, Cong)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE to #100 Pacific Rim's Proposal Re Fees and Interest filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph E. Horey, #2 Exhibit A) (Horey, Joseph)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting #110 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Proposal for Interest and Attorney's Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/01/2020. (BTC)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Proposal for Interest and Attorney's Fees filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Cong Nie appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Nie, Cong)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting #108 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Counterclaims. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/30/2020. (ADE)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Pacific Rim to Respond to Counterclaims filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC, Counter Defendant Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DECISION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #44 Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/28/2020. (ADE)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Pacific Rim Land Develpoment, LLC against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court, Heather L. Kennedy on 04/27/2020. (BTC)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECISION AND ORDER Denying #66 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Granting #85 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/23/2020. (ADE)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to #42 Second Amended Complaint; Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Nie, Cong)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of Lee H. Vensel Regarding #100 Fees and Interests filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DECLARATION of Evangeline Bermeo Regarding #100 Fees and Interests filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of #100 Request for Attorneys Fees filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC's PROPOSAL as to Fees and Interest filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting #98 Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Proposals for Interest and Attorney's Fees [ECF 97]. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 04/08/2020. (BTC)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Submit Proposals for Interest and Attorney's Fees (ECF. #97 ) filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #66 Motion to Dismiss and #85 Motion for Summary Judgment held on 4/2/2020. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Court Denied without prejudice #71 Motion to Quash; Court Denied #66 Motion to Dismiss ; Court Granted #85 Motion for Summary Judgment on 4/2/2020. (FPA)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/1/2020. (ADE)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Conference call instructions will be emailed to the parties. (FPA)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2020. Attorney Colin Thompson appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Joseph Horey appeared on behalf of the Defendant. All parties appeared telephonically. VTC and Dial in Instructions to be emailed to the parties for the 4/2/20 Motion Hearing. (Court Reporter N/A) (FPA)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 12/26/2019 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: HMW. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (BTC)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 12/03/2019 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: HMW. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (BTC)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by All Plaintiffs re (92 in 1:19-cv-00016) Response to Motion . Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Thompson, Colin)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of #85 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: #66 Motion to Dismiss Action, #71 Motion to Quash, #85 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions Hearing set for 4/2/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting #90 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 03/19/2020. (BTC)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Reply re (88 in 1:19-cv-00016) Opposition to Motion, by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Thompson, Colin)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: re #71 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena and Notice of Motion. Motion to Quash Subpoena Hearing set for 03/23/2020 is continued to 4/2/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY to #88 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Action and to Rule 56(d) Response filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Horey, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPPOSITION to Pacific Rim's #85 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joey Patrick San Nicolas) (Horey, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: #71 Motion to Quash. Motion for Quash Hearing set for 3/23/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: #85 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 4/2/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECLARATION of Keith J. Stewart in Support of #85 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support of #85 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC . (Thompson, Colin)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC Responses due by 3/8/2020 (Thompson, Colin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECLARATION of Colin M. Thompson in Support of #83 Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) RESPONSE to Defendant's #66 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Keith J. Stewart in Support of #81 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Thompson, Colin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to Defendant's #66 Motion to Dismiss Action filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPPOSITION to #71 Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Banes, David)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting #76 Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline as to #66 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/14/2020. (ADE)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: #66 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/19/2020 is rescheduled to 4/2/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PLAINTIFF'S SUBMITTAL Re: Certified Questions for Commonwealth Supreme Court (Thompson, Colin)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's SUGGESTED FORMULATION of Certified Questions. (Banes, David)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION to Extend Filing Deadlines as to #66 Motion to Dismiss filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: #72 Motion to Continue Probable Cause hearing held on 2/5/2020. (Court Reporter HMW) (FPA)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #72 Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing. (FPA)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting #73 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/4/2020. (ADE)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: #72 Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing. Motion to Continue the Probable Cause Hearing set for 2/5/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). David G. Banes appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Shorten Time under Local Rule 7.1(f), #2 Notice of Motion to Shorten Time under Local Rule 7.1(f)) (Banes, David)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Continue Probable Cause Hearing. David G. Banes appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing) (Banes, David)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: #66 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/12/2020 is rescheduled to 3/19/2020 at 03:30 PM. #71 Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena is also set for 3/19/2020 at 03:30 p.m. in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena . Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting #69 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Action and Extend Filing Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/30/2020. (FPA)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: #66 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 02/11/2020 is rescheduled to 3/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on #66 Motion to Dismiss and Extend Filing Deadline filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AUDIO RECORDING ORDER filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (ADE)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC for proceedings held on 12/3/2019 and 12/26/2019 before Judge Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Action and MEMORANDUM in Support. Joseph E. Horey appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing) (Horey, Joseph)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: #66 Motion to Dismiss Action. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/11/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #64 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/02/2020. (FPA)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC David G. Banes appearing Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Banes, David)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #43 Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien held on 12/26/2019. #43 Hearing is continued to 2/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit and Witness List) (FPA)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on J.C. Tenorio Enterprises, Inc. on 12/13/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Commonwealth Investment Co., Inc. on 12/23/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on David B. Arriola on 12/26/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WAIVER of Service by Person or Mail and Acceptance of Service through Email filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Served upon Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order #55 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Divide Oral Argument Granted by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/26/2019 . (BTC)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER of Service by Person or Mail and Acceptance of Service through Email filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. Served upon Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC & Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC on 12/14/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Defendant's #49 Opposition to the Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith J. Stewart in Support of Reply to Opposition to the Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien) (Thompson, Colin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to Divide Oral Argument. David G. Banes appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Banes, David)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Motions to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Phillip J. Tydingco terminated in cases 1:19-cv-00016 and 1:19-cv-00024. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (ADE)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Estate of Joaquin LG. Sablan on 12/17/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC & Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC on 12/17/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Department of Public Lands on 12/17/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Service for Second Amended Notice of Lien, Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien, and Notice of Errata served on Department of Public Lands on 12/17/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's #44 Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien and Request to Dismiss,or, in the Alternative, Certify Questions to CNMI Supreme Court filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A-part 1, #4 Exhibit A- part2, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E) (Banes, David)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting #47 Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/18/2019. (FPA)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Hearing on #44 Second Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien set for 12/20/2019 is rescheduled to 12/26/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Continue the Probable Cause Hearing and to Set Simultaneous Briefing Schedule. David G. Banes appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Banes, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by David G. Banes on behalf of Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Banes, David)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: re #43 Second Amended Notice of Lien Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SECOND AMENDED APPLICATION for Mechanic's Lien Pursuant to 4 CMC 5802. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Lien by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from Colin M. Thompson to Phillip J. Tydingco. (Thompson, Colin)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Dismissing #31 First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend, and Denying #33 Amended Application for a Mechanic's Lien without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/09/2019. (ADE)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Phillip J. Tydingco in Support of #6 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Tydingco, Phillip) Modified on 12/10/2019 (ADE, ).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Phillip J. Tydingco appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Tydingco, Phillip)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION of Service filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Consolidating Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/09/2019. (BTC)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Terminate #33 Amended Application for Mechanic's Lien Pursuant to 4 CMC 5802. (ADE)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Hearing on Application for Mechanic's Lien set for 12/10/2019 at 1:30 PM is vacated. (ADE)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF: Timeliness of Lien by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AUDIO RECORDING ORDER by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (ADE)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED APPLICATION for Mechanic's Lien Pursuant to 4 CMC 5802. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE of Lien by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint with Leave to Amend, and Denying #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/04/2019. (ADE)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings held on 12/3/2019. Hearing on #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien is set for 12/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (FPA)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Terminate #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (FPA)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM of Opposition to Plaintiff's #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ADE).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Plaintiff's #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ADE).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Partrick Diaz, Superior Court Clerk on 12/02/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ERRATA filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC re #14 Notice of Lien, #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien re #14 Notice of Lien. (Thompson, Colin) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ADE).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Department of Public Lands on 11/21/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Department of Public Lands on 12/02/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Counsel Re: Service to Interested Parties filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on David B. Arriola on 11/27/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Imperial Pacific Properties, LLC on 11/25/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Estate of Joaquin LG. Sablan on 11/22/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on J.C. Tenorio Enterprises, Inc. on 11/25/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Service for Notice of Lien and Application for Mechanic's Lien served on Commonwealth Investment Co., Inc. on 11/22/2019, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Extending Time for Return of Notice of Lien #15 Application for Mechanic's Lien. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/25/2019. (FPA)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION for Mechanic's #14 Lien Pursuant to 4 CMC 5802. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Lien by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's REPLY to #9 Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 is rescheduled to 12/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ACH)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Reply to Opposition to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/12/2019. (DPB)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time For Reply to Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Phillip J. Tydingco appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION in Support re #9 Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Thompson, Colin)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/28/2019. (ADE)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Briefing Schedule. Colin M. Thompson appearing for Plaintiff Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC (Thompson, Colin)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: on #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 is rescheduled to 12/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: on #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion Hearing is set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 Declaration in Support of Motion #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION in Support of #4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Construction Contract) (Tydingco, Phillip)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Phillip J. Tydingco appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC . Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Thompson, Colin)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Breach of Contract And Breach of Promissory Note against Does 1-5, Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5664.), filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC
Represented By: Colin M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Tydingco
Represented By: David G. Banes
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Represented By: George L. Hasselback
Represented By: Michael Wilfred Dotts
Represented By: Cong Nie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?