Yoshitsu Co. Ltd., v. American Create Beauty Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Yoshitsu Co. Ltd.,
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo and American Dong Sheng Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00022
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants Response to the Complaint #11 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/30/2019. (BTC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. Robert T. Torres appearing for Defendants Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. (Torres, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Response to the #1 Complaint filed by Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. Robert T. Torres appearing for Defendants Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. (Torres, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Reset Hearing: re #12 Order Motion for Preliminary Hearing Injunction set for 01/09/2020 is continued to 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER #7 Extending Time for Defendants' Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/3/2019. (ADE)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER #6 Extending Time for Defendants' Response to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/3/2019. (ADE)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. Robert T. Torres appearing for Defendants Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. (Torres, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to the #1 Complaint by Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. Robert T. Torres appearing for Defendants Does 1 - 10, American Dong Sheng Corporation, American Create Beauty Corporation, Weidong Guo. (Torres, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert T. Torres on behalf of All Defendants (Torres, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE - Served upon American Create Beauty Corp, #1 American Dong Shen Corp, #2 Weidong Guo. Proof of Service - Injunction Served upon #3 American Create Beauty, #4 Weidong Guo. Filed by Yoshitu Co. Ltd. (Nie, Cong) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ADE).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/25/2019. (ADE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Cong Nie appearing for Plaintiff Yoshitsu Co. Ltd., (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Mei Kanayama in Support of Yoshitsu Co., Ltd.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Auralou Sabangan in Support of Yoshitsu Co., Ltd.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Nie, Cong)
November 13, 2019 Set Hearing: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ADE)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Create Beauty Corporation, American Dong Sheng Corporation, Does 1 - 10, Weidong Guo with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5715.), filed by Yoshitsu Co. Ltd., (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Weidong Guo. (BTC)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to American Dong Sheng Corporation. (BTC)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to American Create Beauty Corporation. (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoshitsu Co. Ltd., v. American Create Beauty Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Create Beauty Corporation
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weidong Guo
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Dong Sheng Corporation
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoshitsu Co. Ltd.,
Represented By: Cong Nie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?