Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Plaintiff: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00024
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/02/2020. (FPA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC David G. Banes appearing Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Banes, David)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order REMINDER NOTICE: Case Number 1:19-cv-00024 Shall be Administrative Closed Pursuant to Order to Consolidate Cases (1:19-cv-00016, ECF # 36) Signed by Chief Judge Ramona Manglona on 12/09/2019. All future filings shall be filed in 1:19-cv-00016. DO NOT SPREAD DOCKET ENTRY WHEN PROMPTED DURING FILING IN 1:19-cv-00016. (ADE)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motions to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Phillip J. Tydingco terminated in cases 1:19-cv-00016 and 1:19-cv-00024. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (ADE)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Phillip J. Tydingco in Support of #6 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Tydingco, Phillip)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Phillip J. Tydingco appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00016, 1:19-cv-00024 (Tydingco, Phillip)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Consolidating Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/09/2019. (BTC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Judgment on the Pleadings to #1 Application for Mechanic's Lien by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Tydingco, Phillip)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Application for Mechanic's Lien by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Tydingco, Phillip)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lien by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (ADE)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Mechanic's Lien Pursuant to 4 CMC 5802. (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 09283.) filed by Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Rim Land Development, LLC
Represented By: Colin M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Tydingco
Represented By: David G. Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?