Hart v. Cabras Marine Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John Hart
Defendant: Cabras Marine Corporation, Saipan Marine Corporation, Seabridge Inc., and Seabridge Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE:Case Management Conference Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 02/13/2020. (BTC)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Nicole G. Cruz. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 02/10/2020. (BTC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Local Counsel filed by Robert T. Torres re #4 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Nicole G. Cruz (Filing Fee: $250.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5872.) (BTC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Nicole G. Cruz (Filing Fee: $300.00, Receipt Number: MPX1-5872.) Nicole G. Cruz appearing for Defendants Cabras Marine Corporation, Saipan Marine Corporation, Seabridge Inc. (BTC)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint; Affirmative Defenses by Cabras Marine Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Hart. (Arriola, Anita)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Torres on behalf of Cabras Marine Corporation, Saipan Marine Corporation, Seabridge Inc. (BTC)
December 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Seabridge Inc. (ADE)
December 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Saipan Marine Corporation. (ADE)
December 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cabras Marine Corporation. (ADE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Cabras Marine Corporation, Saipan Marine Corporation, Seabridge Inc. (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100005774.) filed by John Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Cabras Marine Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabras Marine Corporation
Represented By: Nicole G. Cruz
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Represented By: Anita P. Arriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saipan Marine Corporation
Represented By: Nicole G. Cruz
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabridge Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabridge Inc.
Represented By: Nicole G. Cruz
Represented By: Robert T. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hart
Represented By: David G. Banes
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?