Ping Shun Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Plaintiff: Ping Shun Corporation
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00012
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 373 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 7/22/2020. (FPA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (Hasselback, George)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 First Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer Due 7/21/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/13/2020. (BTC)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. George L. Hasselback appearing for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel in Support of First Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File) (Hasselback, George)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Mok, Samuel)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Mok, Samuel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00. receipt number MPX100006065), filed by Ping Shun Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ping Shun Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping Shun Corporation
Represented By: Samuel I Mok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?