Fargo v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Milan F. Fargo
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Department of Homeland Security served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (FPA)
September 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (ADE)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/04/2020. (ADE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Amended Cover Sheet, #2 Email from Milan Fargo) (DPB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security with Jury Demand filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint, #2 Redacted Complaint, #3 USDOJ Letter to Milan Fargo, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DPB )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fargo v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan F. Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?