Genc et al v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hasan Gokce, Ozcan Genc and Suleyman Kos
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd., Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC and IDS Development Management & Consultancy
Case Number: 1:2020cv00031
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC and Imperial Pacific International Holdings Ltd. Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos (Miller, Richard)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 2:00 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 1/13/2021. (ADE)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos (Miller, Richard)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminate #14 Motion for Extension. (ADE)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Hearing on #13 MOTION to Certify Class is set for 1/22/2021 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Certify Class Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A Taahhutname (Turkish), #2 Exhibit 1B Letter of Commitment (English)) (Miller, Richard)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NAMES of Opt-In Plaintiffs by Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos (Miller, Richard)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #4 Motion for Preliminary Certification Collective Action held on 12/30/2020. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 9:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerk's AMENDED ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC and Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd. (ADE)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #7 Motion to Shorten Time. (FPA)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #4 Motion for Preliminary Certification of Collective Action. (FPA)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT by Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos re #4 MOTION to Certify Class Opt-in Consent of Fuat Mert Oztuna. (Miller, Richard)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Hearing on #4 MOTION to Certify Class is set for 12/30/2020 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Ordered by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/28/2020. (DPB)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION filed by Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos re #7 MOTION to Shorten Time re #4 MOTION to Certify Class . (Miller, Richard)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f) re #4 Motion to Certify Class . Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos . (Miller, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd., and IDS Development Management & Consultancy (DPB)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate #5 Motion for Entry of Default. (DPB)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard C. Miller in support of entry of default, #2 Exhibit proof of service on IPI (CNMI), #3 Exhibit proof of service on IPI Holdings) (Miller, Richard)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Hearing on #4 MOTION to Certify Class is set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class Richard C Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Miller, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ali akir, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Ertan Gl, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Ramazan Tekten, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit Consents to opt in to collective action, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit Consents to Opt In to Collective Action) (Miller, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2020: #7 Exhibit CV 20-00031 REDACTED Exhibit 5 - Consents to opt in to collective action #8 REDACTED Exhibit 6 - Consents to opt in to collective action) (DPB)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION filed by All Plaintiffs Proof of Service on IPI Holdings Ltd.. (Miller, Richard)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROOF of Service on IPI (CNMI). (Miller, Richard)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd., and IDS Development Management & Consultancy with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100006237.), filed by Ozcan Genc, Hasan Gokce, Suleyman Kos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (ADE)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to IDS Development Management & Consultancy. (ADE)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd. (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genc et al v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasan Gokce
Represented By: Richard C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozcan Genc
Represented By: Richard C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suleyman Kos
Represented By: Richard C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Development Management & Consultancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?