Aguon v. Attao et al
Plaintiff: Steven Romie Aguon
Defendant: Gregory Castro, Keith Lizama, Wally Villagomez, Vincent Attao, Raymond Sablan, Kevin Simina, Pete Samorang, Georgia Cabrera, Alvin Napaial and Patrick Dowai
Case Number: 1:2021cv00003
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gregory Castro served on 3/25/2021.(DPB)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing Set for March 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is continued to 4/5/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. So Ordered by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 3/26/2021. (ADE)
March 26, 2021 Terminate #7 Motion. (ADE)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing Set for March 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Leslie A. Healer appearing for Defendant Wally Villagomez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Healer, Leslie)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie A. Healer on behalf of Wally Villagomez (Healer, Leslie)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS in a Civil Action Returned Executed. Vincent Attao served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (FPA)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS in a Civil Action Returned Executed. Patrick Dowai served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (FPA)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Patrick Dowai. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Pete Samorang. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Kevin Simina. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Alvin Napaial. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Raymond Sablan. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Vincent Attao. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Georgia Cabrera. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Gregory Castro. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Wally Villagomez. (ADE)
March 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Keith Lizama. (ADE)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 IFP Application, Directing Service of Complaint, and Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 3/8/2021. (ADE)
March 8, 2021 Terminate #1 Motion. (ADE)
March 8, 2021 Certificate of Mailing: First-class mail of a copy of the #3 Screening Order Granting Plaintiff's IFP Application, Directing Service of Complaint, and Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing was served upon Steven Romie Aguon. (ADE)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Vincent Attao, Gregory Castro, Wally Villagomez, Keith Lizama, Georgia Cabrera, Raymond Sablan, Alvin Napaial, Patrick Dowai, Pete Samorang, Kevin Simina filed by Steven Romie Aguon. (ADE)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Steven Aguon. (Attachments: #1 Draft Complaint) (DPB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguon v. Attao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wally Villagomez
Represented By: Leslie A. Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Attao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sablan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Simina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Samorang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Napaial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dowai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Romie Aguon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?