Sablan v. Sablan Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Maria Verna Liza Sablan
Defendant: Sablan Corporation, Sablan Enterprises, Inc., Sablan Construction Co., Ltd. and Conrad Muna Sablan
Case Number: 1:2022cv00013
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant Sablan Enterprises, Inc.'s JOINDER in Defendants Sablan Corporation, Sablan Construction Co., Ltd. and Conrad M. Sablans #11 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Filed by Joey P. San Nicolas appearing for Defendant Sablan Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 11/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tito M. Sablan, #2 Supplement Entry of Appearance) (San Nicolas, Joey)
November 22, 2022 Set Hearings: Hearing on #11 Motion to Dismiss is set for 1/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Sablan Corp., SCCL, and Mr. Sablan (Nicholas, Brien)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/1/2022. (ADE)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by Defendants Sablan Corp., SCCL, and Conrad M. Sablan. Brien Sers Nicholas, Sr appearing for Defendants Conrad Muna Sablan, Sablan Corporation, Sablan Construction Co., Ltd. (Nicholas, Brien)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance and REQUEST for Service filedby Brien Sers Nicholas, Sr on behalf of Conrad Muna Sablan, Sablan Construction Co., Ltd., Sablan Corporation (Nicholas, Brien)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maria Verna Liza Sablan. Served upon Maria Verna Liza Sablan (Horey, Joseph)
October 12, 2022 Filing 6 ERRATUM: Exhibits to #1 Complaint filed by Maria Verna Liza Sablan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Horey, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Verna Liza Sablan. Sablan Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Horey, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Verna Liza Sablan. Conrad Muna Sablan served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Horey, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Verna Liza Sablan. Sablan Construction Co., Ltd. served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Horey, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Verna Liza Sablan. Sablan Corporation served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Horey, Joseph)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages. Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: MPX100006930. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LCG)
September 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to Sablan Corporation. (LCG)
September 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to Sablan Enterprises, Inc. (LCG)
September 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to Sablan Construction Co., Ltd. (LCG)
September 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to Conrad Muna Sablan. (LCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sablan v. Sablan Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Verna Liza Sablan
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sablan Corporation
Represented By: Brien Sers Nicholas, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sablan Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sablan Construction Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Brien Sers Nicholas, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Muna Sablan
Represented By: Brien Sers Nicholas, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?