Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands et al
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Arnold Palacios, Edward C Deleon Guerrero, Rafael S Demapan, Mariano Taitano, Martin Mendiola, Ramon M. Dela Cruz, Andrew Yeom and Commonwealth Casino Commission of the Commonwealth of Northern Marianas Islands
Case Number: 1:2024cv00001
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for 1. Unconstitutional Impairment of Contract and Violation of the Contracts Clause of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 2. Violation of the Due Process Clauses of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 3. Violation of Article IV of CNMI Constittion; 4. Breach of Casio License Agreement; 5. Declaratory Relief, Injunction and Restittuion. Demand for Jury Trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Chen, Michael)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPPOSITION to #21 #20 #19 Defendants CNMI, Demapan, and Taitano's Motion to Dismiss. Concurrently filed with First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Chen, Michael)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECISION and ORDER Denying #23 Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 4/5/2024. (JXP)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DEFENDANTS Edward C. Deleon Guerrero, Rafael S. Demapan, Mariano Taitano, Martin Mendiola, and Ramon M. Dela Cruz's Response to #33 Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 33). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PLAINTIFF IPI's Response to #33 Order to Show Case (ECF No. 33). (Chen, Michael)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2024, at 1:30 PM. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 04/01/2024. (FPA)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Approving #26 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 4/1/2024. (JXP)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PLAINTIFF's Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Chen, Michael)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DEFENDANTS Edward C. Deleon Guerrero, Rafael S. Demapan, Mariano Taitano, Martin Mendiola, and Ramon M. Dela Cruz submit their Brief in Opposition to #23 Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE by Defendant Arnold Palacios to #23 Plaintiff IPI's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Halegua, Aaron)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DEFENDANT Andrew Yeom's Opposition to #23 Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Nelson, Alison)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS' Opposition to #23 Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. (Glass, Jr., Jonathan Robert)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel. Jonathan Robert Glass, Jr. appearing for Defendant Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands. (Glass, Jr., Jonathan Robert)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. Served Upon All Defendants. (Nutting, Stephen)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order In accordance with LR 7.1(a)(2), Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #23 , will be decided on the briefs by the Court. Responses to Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order are due March 29, 2024. (FPA)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Howyo Chi in Support of #23 Plaintiff's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Chen, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PLAINTIFF's Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Michael Chen appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit) (Chen, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz on behalf of Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Rafael S Demapan, and Mariano Taitano. (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order In accordance with LR 7.1(a)(2), Defendants Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Rafael S. Demapan, and Mariano Taitano's Motion to Dismiss, ECF Nos. #19 #20 #21 , will be decided on the briefs by the Court. (FPA)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DEFENDANTS Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Rafael S. Demapan, and Mariano Taitano's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz appearing for Defendant Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DEFENDANTS Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Rafael S. Demapan, and Mariano Taitano's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz appearing for Defendant Mariano Taitano. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DEFENDANTS Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Rafael S. Demapan, and Mariano Taitano's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz appearing for Defendant Rafael S Demapan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Motion to Extend Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 3/22/2024. (JXP)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Admitting #12 Aaron Halegua Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 3/20/2024. (JXP)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Honorable David O. Carter is Temporarily Designated for the District Court of the Northern Mariana Islands. (JXP)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Self-Recusal. Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona recused. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 3/14/2024. (FPA)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT Motion to Extend Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Alison M. Nelson appearing for Defendant Andrew Yeom. (Nelson, Alison)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Consent by Bruce Berline in Support of #12 Application to Admit Aaron Halegua Pro Hac Vice. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: ANMIDC-450889.) (Berline, Bruce)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Aaron Halegua. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: ANMIDC-450889.) Bruce L. Berline appearing for Defendant Arnold Palacios. (Berline, Bruce)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Brendan Layde on behalf of Arnold Palacios. (Layde, John)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce L. Berline on behalf of Arnold Palacios. (Berline, Bruce)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Decision Denying #2 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 2/29/2024. (FPA)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Designated Judge David O. Carter: Hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 2/27/2024. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 2/27/2024 at 2:30 PM in the 3rd Floor Courtroom before Designated Judge David O. Carter. (FPA)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Terminate #2 #3 Motion for TRO. (FPA)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Declaration of Chi. (Chen, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Michael Chen for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 02/26/2024. (ACH)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT to Serve as Local Counsel and Designee for Michael Chen filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (TVW)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Michael Chen Appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: 100010219.) (TVW)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Points and Authorities in Support of Motion Stephen J. Nutting appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Chen in Support of TRO, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Howyo Chi, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supreme Court Opinion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Casino License Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2- CCC Annual Reports, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Commission Order No. 2021-002, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4-CNMI Superior Court Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Notice of Payment Deadline, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Complaint 2021-002, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Complaint-2021-003, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8- Motion to Set Revocation Hearing, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Joint Stipulation to Postpone Revocation Hearing, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10- CCC Plans to Proceed with Revocation Hearing on 2/28/24, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11- Email from CNMI AAG Blaise, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12-MOU betwen IPIH and Kyosei, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13- Prsentation Material by Kyosei, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14- Wire Transfer Record) (Nutting, Stephen)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Stephen J. Nutting appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC (Nutting, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for 1. Unconstitutional Impairment of Contract and Violation of the Contracts Clause of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 2. Violation of the Due Process Clauses of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 3. Violation of Article IV of CNMI Constittion; 4. Breach of Casio License Agreement; 5. Declaratory Relief, Injunction and Restittuion against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 10217.), filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Edward C Deleon Guerrero. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Arnold Palacios. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Rafael S Demapan. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Ramon M. Dela Cruz. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Andrew Yeom. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Martin Mendiola. (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Mariano Taitano. (TVW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Nutting
Represented By: Michael Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Glass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Palacios
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Represented By: Aaron Halegua
Represented By: John Brendan Layde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C Deleon Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael S Demapan
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariano Taitano
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Mendiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon M. Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Yeom
Represented By: Alison M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Casino Commission of the Commonwealth of Northern Marianas Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?