Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands et al
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Arnold Palacios, Edward C Deleon Guerrero, Rafael S Demapan, Mariano Taitano, Martin Mendiola, Ramon M. Dela Cruz and Andrew Yeom
Case Number: 1:2024cv00002
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant Arnold Palacios in his Personal Capacity. Aaron Halegua appearing for Defendant Arnold Palacios. (Halegua, Aaron)
April 12, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz on behalf of Ramon M. Dela Cruz, Edward C Deleon Guerrero, Rafael S Demapan, Martin Mendiola, Mariano Taitano (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
April 11, 2024 Filing 18 DEFENDANTS Demapan and Taitano's Opposition to #15 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default. (Dela Cruz, Carl Allen)
April 5, 2024 Filing 17 COMMONWEALTH of the Northern Mariana Islands' Opposition to #15 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default. (Glass, Jr., Jonathan Robert)
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel. (Glass, Jr., Jonathan Robert)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST for Entry of Default. Michael Chen appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Chen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Chen, Michael)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. Served Upon All Defendants. (Nutting, Stephen)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #9 Joint Motion to Extend Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 3/22/2024. (JXP)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Admitting #7 Aaron Halegua Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 3/20/2024. (JXP)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Honorable David O. Carter is Temporarily Designated for the District Court of the Northern Mariana Islands. (JXP)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Self-Recusal. Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona recused. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 3/14/2024. (FPA)
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 JOINT Motion to Extend Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f). Alison M. Nelson appearing for Defendant Andrew Yeom. (Nelson, Alison)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Consent by Bruce Berline in Support of #7 Application to Admit Aaron Halegua Pro Hac Vice. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: ANMIDC-450898.) (Berline, Bruce)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Aaron Halegua. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: ANMIDC-450898.) Bruce L. Berline appearing for Defendant Arnold Palacios. (Berline, Bruce)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Brendan Layde on behalf of Arnold Palacios. (Layde, John)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce L. Berline on behalf of Arnold Palacios. (Berline, Bruce)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Michael Chen for Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. Signed by Designated Judge David O. Carter on 02/26/2024. (ACH)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT to Serve as Local Counsel and Designee for Michael Chen filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (TVW)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Michael Chen Appearing for Plaintiff Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Filing Fee: $300, Receipt Number: 100010220.) (TVW)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for 1. Unconstitutional Impairment of Contract and Violation of the Contracts Clause of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 2. Violation of the Takings Clause of the U.S. Constitution; 3. Violation of the Due Process Clauses of the U.S. and CNMI Constitutions; 4. Breach of Casio License Agreement; 5. Declaratory Relief, Injunction and Restitution against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 10218.), filed by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Rafael S Demapan. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Edward C Deleon Guerrero. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Mariano Taitano. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Andrew Yeom. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Arnold Palacios. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Ramon M. Dela Cruz. (FPA)
February 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Martin Mendiola. (FPA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC v. Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI) LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Nutting
Represented By: Michael Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Glass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Palacios
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Represented By: Aaron Halegua
Represented By: John Brendan Layde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C Deleon Guerrero
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael S Demapan
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariano Taitano
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Mendiola
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon M. Dela Cruz
Represented By: Carl Allen Flores Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Yeom
Represented By: Alison M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?