Heike v. Guevara et al

Plaintiff: Brooke Elizabeth Heike
Defendant: Sue Guevara, Dave Heeke, Patricia Pickler and Central Michigan University Board of Trustees
Case Number: 1:2009cv10427
Filed: February 3, 2009
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Bay City Office
County: Isabella
Referring Judge: Binder
Presiding Judge: Ludington
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Amount of Sanctions Imposed on Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel. (Amount due by 2/18/2011) Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)
September 30, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Sanctions, Directing Supplemental Briefing and Sustaining Plaintiff's Objection to Costs Taxed. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. [Defendant's supplemental brief due 10/15/2010; Plaintiff's responsive brief due 11/5/2010] (SGam)
February 9, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to dismiss and dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's defamation claim against Coach Guevara, and cancelling hearing. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (DPer)
November 6, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Remainder of 24 Motion to Dismiss, Dismissing Plaintiff's Negligent Hiring and Negligent Supervision Claims Against Defendant Heeke, Dismissing Plaintiff's Defamation Claims Against Defendants Heeke and Pickler and Granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend the Complaint to Allege Special Damages. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)
September 2, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Directing Supplemental Briefing, Canceling Hearing, Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Central Michigan University Board of Trustees, and Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants Sue Guevara, Dave Heeke, and Patricia Pickler in their Official Capacities Except to the Extent that Plaintiff's Federal Claims Seek Prospective Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (THal)
June 3, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing 14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heike v. Guevara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Heeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Pickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Michigan University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Elizabeth Heike
Represented By: Cindy R. Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?