Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc v. Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Plaintiff: Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc
Defendant: Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Counter_claimant: Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Counter_defendant: Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv10961
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Midland
Presiding Judge: Charles E. Binder
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Opinion and ORDER denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Breach of Contract Claims. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. [Final pre-trial and trial dates unchanged, refer to image for other due dates] (SGam)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 142 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION and ORDER Directing Supplemental Briefing, Dismissing Claims and Denying as Moot 131 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings as to 60 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment : (Mersen's supplemental brief due by 5/31/2013; GMSI's supplemental brief du 6/14/2013). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 13 , 14 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer; granting 22 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc v. Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Brissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc
Represented By: Richard A. Gaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphite Machining Services & Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Brissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mersen USA- Midland-MI Inc
Represented By: Joseph Infante - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Richard A. Gaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?