Wolf v. Causley Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frances M Wolf
Defendant: Causley Trucking, Inc. and Gregory Causley
Case Number: 1:2015cv12530
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Saginaw
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #59 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment [Appeal Case Number 17-1683] (SKra)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #52 Notice of Appeal, filed by Frances M Wolf [Appeal Case Number 17-1683] (DWor)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Defendant's #54 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 8/2/2017 is Cancelled re #54 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion will be decided on the papers. (KWin)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response re #54 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Lowe, Timothy)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to #54 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF HEARING on #54 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2017 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Timothy Lowe, #3 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Antoinette Pilzner, #4 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Stephen Kandra) (Lowe, Timothy)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Certificate of Service re #52 Notice of Appeal,. (BGar)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Frances M Wolf re #51 Judgment, #50 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendation. Receipt No: 0645-6263123 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Concannon, Andrew)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Adopting #47 Report and Recommendation, Granting Defendant's #40 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying Plaintiff's #39 Motion to Vacate the Administrative Decision. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE to #48 Objection to Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Lowe, Timothy)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OBJECTION to #47 Report and Recommendation by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Counts I, II and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Causley Trucking, Inc., Gregory Causley, #39 MOTION to Vacate Administrate Decision/Appeal Brief filed by Frances M Wolf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response re #39 MOTION to Vacate Administrate Decision/Appeal Brief filed by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Counts I, II and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by All Defendants. (Lowe, Timothy)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Findings of Fact by All Defendants (Lowe, Timothy)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Counts I, II and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Frances M Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Greg Causley) (Concannon, Andrew)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to #39 MOTION to Vacate Administrate Decision/Appeal Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Reverse Administrator's Decision to Withhold Benefits filed by All Defendants. (Lowe, Timothy)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Counts I, II and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service, #39 MOTION to Vacate Administrate Decision/Appeal Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Counts I, II and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Deposition Transcript of Gregory H. Causley, #3 Exhibit 2. Principal Financial Group Premiums Paid Statement (Oct. 14, 2015), #4 Exhibit 3. E-mail to Plaintiff (Aug. 25, 2014), #5 Exhibit 4. Plaintiff's Dep Tr., pg. 18:2-7) (Lowe, Timothy)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Vacate Administrate Decision/Appeal Brief by Frances M Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Deposition of Greg Causely, #2 Certificate of Service) (Concannon, Andrew)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Exhibit 15 (Additional Exhibit) of Administrative Record (Dkt. #36) and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SUPPLEMENT TO EXHIBIT 8 OF SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD [DKT. #36] AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by All Defendants. (Lowe, Timothy)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER for ERISA: Administrative Record due by 9/16/2016, Discovery Cutoff 11/16/2016, Cross Motions due by 12/16/2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KKra)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Procedural Challenge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KKra)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #28 Statement Regarding Procedural Challenge and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. September 9, 2014 Letter, #3 Exhibit B. September 18, 2014 Letter, #4 Exhibit C. October 3, 2014 Letter, #5 Exhibit D. December 12, 2014 Letter, #6 Exhibit E. April 9, 2015 Letter) (Lowe, Timothy)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Directing Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Procedural Challenge. (Response due by 6/9/2016) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KKra)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Procedural Challenge Hearing on 8/10/2016 is Cancelled. (Sian, M)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Procedural Challenge Hearing set for 8/10/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT of Defendant's Statement Concerning Case Management Order by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc. (Lowe, Timothy)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATEMENT of Regarding Procedural Challenge by Frances M Wolf (Concannon, Andrew)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Frances M Wolf [Appeal Case Number 16-1232] (Ahmed, N)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER for ERISA: Procedural Challenge Statements due by 5/6/2016, Administrative Record due by 7/5/2016, and Cross Motions due by 8/4/2016. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Service re #24 Notice of Appeal. (SOso)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Frances M Wolf. Receipt No: 0645-5569533 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Concannon, Andrew)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Response due by 3/8/2016) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying #13 Motion to Remand and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service and #13 MOTION to Remand. (Sian, M)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motions Hearing on 1/28/2016 is Cancelled. (Sian, M)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER Adjourning Motion Hearing. Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #13 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service : (Motion Hearing reset for 1/28/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 and Certificate of Service filed by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2015 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 MOTION to Remand by Frances M Wolf (Concannon, Andrew)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2015 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sandusky, K)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Principal Life Insurance Company Policy for Mr. Rieck, #3 Exhibit 2. January 6, 2015 Letter from McDonald Hopkins PLC to Smith Bovill, P.C.) (Lowe, Timothy)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc. of withdrawal of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service . (Lowe, Timothy)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Amended Complaint, #7 Response to Motion by Frances M Wolf (Concannon, Andrew)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Frances M Wolf against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Concannon, Andrew)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service filed by Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Concannon on behalf of Frances M Wolf. (Concannon, Andrew)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2015 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sandusky, K)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Causley Trucking, Inc. (Lowe, Timothy)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe on behalf of Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gregory Causley, Causley Trucking, Inc. from Saginaw County Circuit Court, case number 15-026861-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-5249752 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Exhibit 1, #2 Document Continuation Exhibit 2) (Lowe, Timothy)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Causley Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances M Wolf
Represented By: Danelle E. Albosta
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Causley Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Causley
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?