Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Plaintiff: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Case Number: 1:2016cv10317
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Isabella
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPINION and ORDER Granting 173 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying as Moot 193 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Compel, and Dismissing 7 Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Denying 142 Motion to Dismiss and Directing Discovery. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Stipulated ORDER Regarding Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Denying Defendant's 118 Motion for Attorney Fees, Granting in Part Plaintiff's 119 Motion for Attorney Fees, and Granting in Part 123 Motion to Review Taxed Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Opinion and ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Granting in Part Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Denying as Moot 109 , 110 Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Overruling Objections and Denying 72 Motion to Strike Expert Opinion. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Directing Defendant to Respond. Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to 80 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Motion for Order that Documents may be filed in the Public Record: (Defendant's Response due by 4/21/2017). Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Dismiss, Dismissing Counts I & III-IX of Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan
Represented By: Jeffrey David Koelzer
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Jeffrey David Koelzer
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?