LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. v. DeVere Construction Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: DeVere Construction Co., Inc., Crittenden Construction Co., Inc., Reds Traders Limited, Richard Lee Crittenden, Michael Bruce Crittenden, Cynthia Sue Gabara, Cheryl Jean Lumsden, DeVere Swepco JV, LLC and DeVere Construction Company MI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv10423
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Alpena
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 05:75
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Summary Judgment and 102 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Entering Judgment as to Count One. (Status Report due by 5/29/2017.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Cancelling Hearing, Denying 72 MOTION for Reconsideration, Granting 73 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Discovery Orders, Imposing Sanctions, Granting 79 MOTION to Amend 31 Scheduling Order, Denying [ 81] MOTION to Strike Defendants' 80 Reply to Response and Setting In-Person Status Conference. (Status Conference set for 10/25/2016 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington, S ettlement Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington, Discovery due by 12/16/2016, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/27/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2017 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington, Jury Trial set for 5/30/2017 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SBur)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Compel, Directing Posting of Collateral, Imposing Civil Sanction, Denying In Part 63 Motion to Quash, and Directing Submission of Stipulated Protective Order. (Stipulated Protective Order due by 8/1/2016) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CANCELLING Hearing, GRANTING 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Requiring Posting on or before June 24, 2016; GRANTING 50 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer on or before June 17, 2016. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (LWag)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion for Clarification and Amending April 14, 2016 Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (AChu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. v. DeVere Construction Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: John E. Sebastian
Represented By: Alan R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVere Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reds Traders Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lee Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bruce Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Sue Gabara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Jean Lumsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVere Swepco JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVere Construction Company MI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?