Federal Insurance Company v. Fairbotham
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Penny Fairbotham
Case Number: 1:2016cv11390
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Otsego
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION and ORDER Stating Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation, Denying Defendant's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Scheduling Status Conference. (Status and Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Fairbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles T. Oxender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Fairbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?