Selley v. Midland, County of et al
Plaintiff: Mark Selley
Defendant: Jamie Pfund, Sean Dull, Jeffery Derocher, Brian Keidel, Midland, County of, Joshua Qualls, Richard Harnois, Richard Speich, Benjamin Hinson, Lorren Hurren, Amy Randall, Shannon Whyte and Brent Hepinstall
Case Number: 1:2018cv12263
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Midland
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/12/2019; Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/12/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 7/16/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating #24 Order to Submit Material for Case Management Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 [VACATED] ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. ( Response due by 9/19/2018.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) Modified on 9/13/2018 Per Text-Only Order Issued on 9/13/2018 (KWin).
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #22 Answer to Amended Complaint Response to Affirmative Defenses by Mark Selley. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Brege, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brent Hepinstall served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018; Shannon Whyte served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard Speich served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued for *Brent Hepinstall, Shannon Whyte* (DWor)
August 16, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mark Selley against Jeffery Derocher, Sean Dull, Richard Harnois, Benjamin Hinson, Brian Keidel, Jamie Pfund, Joshua Qualls, Amy Randall, Richard Speich, Shannon Whyte, Brent Hepinstall. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 16, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Brent Hepinstall, Shannon Whyte. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Amend. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria L. Convertino on behalf of All Defendants. (Convertino, Victoria)
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Brege on behalf of All Defendants. (Brege, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint as of Right by Mark Selley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint) (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jeffery Derocher served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midland, County of served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brian Keidel served on 7/28/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lorren Hurren served on 7/28/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jamie Pfund served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Benjamin Hinson served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sean Dull served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard Harnois served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joshua Qualls served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amy Randall served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (DeRouin, Amy)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Avern Cohn* and *Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (ATee)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Selley against Jeffery Derocher, Sean Dull, Richard Harnois, Benjamin Hinson, Lorren Hurren, Brian Keidel, Midland County, Jamie Pfund, Joshua Qualls, Amy Randall, Richard Speich with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6823981 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Midland. [Previously dismissed case: United States District Court, 15-14320 and 16-10086, Judge Sean F. Cox and Thomas L. Ludington] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, 17-12834, Judge Thomas L. Ludington] (Trainor, Christopher)
July 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selley v. Midland, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Pfund
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Dull
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Derocher
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keidel
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland, County of
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Qualls
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harnois
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Speich
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hinson
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorren Hurren
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Randall
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Whyte
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Hepinstall
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Selley
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Represented By: Amy J. DeRouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?