AT&T Corporation v. SpeedNet-SEM LLC
Plaintiff: AT&T Corporation
Defendant: SpeedNet-SEM LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv12791
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by SpeedNet-SEM LLC. (Sheehan, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint. (Response due by 10/29/2018.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sheehan on behalf of SpeedNet-SEM LLC. (Sheehan, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *SpeedNet-SEM LLC* (ATee)
September 7, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by AT&T Corporation against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6895110 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw County - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Fishman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corporation v. SpeedNet-SEM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: Ryan J Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpeedNet-SEM LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?