Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company et al v. Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company and FCCI Insurance Company
Defendant: Air Advantage, LLC, Arlene Frank, Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc. and J. Ranck Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv13163
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Brian T. McGorisk re #10 Stipulation. Per ECF Policies and Procedures Rule 11A, Stipulations and Proposed Orders Must be Forwarded Through the Proposed Order Portal; Utilities/ Proposed Order Function. Document #10 was Stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KWin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Air Advantage, LLC, J. Ranck Electric, Inc. (McGorisk, Brian) Modified on 12/6/2018 (KWin).
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. McGorisk on behalf of Air Advantage, LLC, J. Ranck Electric, Inc.. (McGorisk, Brian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Air Advantage, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Wilinski, Nicole)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Wilinski, Nicole)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Cernak on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cernak, Margaret)
October 10, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Air Advantage, LLC, Arlene Frank, Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc., J. Ranck Electric, Inc.* (DWor)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow* and *Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (SSch)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCCI Insurance Company (Wilinski, Nicole)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company (Wilinski, Nicole)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6940713 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Sarasota - County Where Action Arose: Tuscola - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Wilinski, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company et al v. Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole E. Wilinski
Represented By: Margaret A. Cernak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole E. Wilinski
Represented By: Margaret A. Cernak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Brian T. McGorisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Contracting Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ranck Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. McGorisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?