Intense Fitness Products, Inc. v. Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intense Fitness Products, Inc.
Defendant: Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv13464
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Katz, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rogers Athletic Company, Inc. (Atallah, David)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 1/4/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.. (Atallah, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Katz on behalf of Intense Fitness Products, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. ( Response due by 12/13/2018.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Plaintiffs (MacWilliams, Sara)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Coon on behalf of Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.. (Coon, Benjamin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Atallah on behalf of Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.. (Atallah, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Patent Report Sent To Washington (MacWilliams, Sara)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Sara Klettke MacWilliams. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Intense Fitness Products, Inc. FRCP 7.1 corporate disclosure (MacWilliams, Sara)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.* (ATee)
November 6, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Rogers Athletic Company, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6978983 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Clare - County of 1st Defendant: Clare. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Patent) (MacWilliams, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intense Fitness Products, Inc. v. Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intense Fitness Products, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Klettke MacWilliams
Represented By: Robert D. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Athletic Company, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Coon
Represented By: David L. Atallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?