Gatete v. Adducci et al

Petitioner: Melody Selman Gatete
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Warden Christopher Larose, Director Rebecca Adducci, Deputy Director Ronald Vitiello, Acting Atty General Matthew Whitaker and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv10443
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Stipulated ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading. (Response due by 3/7/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Goulding appearing on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, William P. Barr (Goulding, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation filed by Melody Selman Gatete against Rebecca Adducci, Christopher Larose, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker, Receipt No: 0645-7108663 - Fee: 5 dollars. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Oral decision, Immigration Judge, #3 Exhibit Board of Immigration Appeals dismissal, #4 Exhibit Detention reviews, #5 Exhibit Letter of Good Conduct) (Boren, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatete v. Adducci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Christopher Larose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Rebecca Adducci
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deputy Director Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Atty General Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melody Selman Gatete
Represented By: Gary B. Boren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?