Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc.
Defendant: Johntrell Anderson
Case Number: 1:2019cv10854
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause on Johntrell Anderson, 1293 Tittabawassee Rd, Apt. B, Saginaw, MI 48604. (KWin)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johntrell Anderson. (KCas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Johntrell Anderson* (DWor)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Johntrell Anderson by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (de Luca, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to *Johntrell Anderson*. Reason: *A REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default has not been requested and processed.* (DWor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to Johntrell Anderson in the amount of $ 87307.02 by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (de Luca, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Amended Complaint by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (de Luca, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Written Show Cause Response due by 7/3/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. against Johntrell Anderson. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (de Luca, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Johntrell Anderson served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (de Luca, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Johntrell Anderson* (DAll)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. (de Luca, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. against Johntrell Anderson. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7166115 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Essex - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (de Luca, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc. v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johntrell Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a MiddleOak a/s/o KMG Prestige, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?