Caravan Facilities Management, LLC v. Hausrath Building Maintenance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Defendant: Hausrath Building Maintenance, Inc. and Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11310
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Complaint for Want of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Concannon, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Putzig, Scot)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc.*. Reason: *Dispositive Motion filed 5/14/2019* (SOso)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Hausrath Building Maintenance, Inc., Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc.. (Concannon, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc. by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Putzig, Scot)
May 7, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc.. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Concannon, Andrew)
May 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 6, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Andrew D. Concannon re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Saginaw County Circuit Court, case number 19-039030. Receipt No: 0645-7227589 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Concannon, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC v. Hausrath Building Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hausrath Building Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hausrath Landscape Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Represented By: Scot Curtis Putzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?