The Dow Chemical Company v. Maughon
Plaintiff: The Dow Chemical Company
Defendant: Bob R. Maughon
Case Number: 1:2019cv11345
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Protective Order by Bob R. Maughon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mastromarco, Victor) Modified on 7/1/2019 (KWin).
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KWin)
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington: Motion Hearing held in chambers on 6/4/2019 re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule, and #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 4:30 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. ***Call-In Number: 888-808-6929; Access Code: 9250878#***) Disposition: Continued. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KWin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion For Expedited Discovery Schedule filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Olsen, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion For Preliminary Injuction filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Olsen, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Bob R. Maughon. (Mastromarco, Victor)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bob R. Maughon. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Maughon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Unpublished Case, #4 Exhibit 3 - Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Definition, #6 Exhibit 5- Article) (Babcock, Russell)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule filed by Bob R. Maughon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - District Court Decision) (Babcock, Russell)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr on behalf of Bob R. Maughon. (Mastromarco, Victor)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell C. Babcock on behalf of Bob R. Maughon. (Babcock, Russell)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, by The Dow Chemical Company (Rosenman, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, on Bob R. Maughon to Russell C. Babcock, The Mastromarco Firm, 1024 N. Michigan Avenue, Saginaw, MI 48602. (KWin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , and #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule. Responses due by 5/24/2019; Replies due by 5/31/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bob R. Maughon served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Olsen, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories to Maughon, #3 Exhibit 2 - Document Requests to Maughon, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Notice of Maughon, #5 Exhibit 4 - Document Subpoena to SABIC Americas, #6 Exhibit 5- Deposition Subpoena to SABIC Americas) (Olsen, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Olsen, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for The Dow Chemical Company. (Olsen, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Rosenman on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Rosenman, Andrew)
May 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Bob R. Maughon* (DWor)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Bardelli on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Bardelli, Edward)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Dow Chemical Company against Bob R. Maughon. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7230239 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Olsen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Dow Chemical Company v. Maughon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob R. Maughon
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Russell C. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Michael A. Olsen
Represented By: Edward J. Bardelli
Represented By: Andrew S. Rosenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?