Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Altman Management Company
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Altman Management Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11405
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
3 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Document Continuation Proof of Service) (Fabian, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (SSch)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Altman Management Company waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
May 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company against Altman Management Company. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7235879 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Maricopa County, Arizona - County Where Action Arose: Midland County - County of 1st Defendant: Palm Beach County, Florida. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - March 18, 2019 Letter to Altman, #3 Exhibit C - April 19, 2019 Letter from Altman, #4 Exhibit D - May 9, 2019 Letter to Altman, #5 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations) (Schwartz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Altman Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altman Management Company
Represented By: Michael H. Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?