Petrojebla, SA de CV v. Betron Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Petrojebla, SA de CV
Defendant: Richard Eugene Betron, Jr, Betron Enterprises, Inc. and Betron LP Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11439
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) on the Pleadings as to Count IV of the Complaint Against Defendant Richard E. Betron, Jr. by Petrojebla, SA de CV. (Falkenstein, Peter)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Powers on behalf of Richard Eugene Betron, Jr, Betron Enterprises, Inc., Betron LP Gas, Inc.. (Powers, David)
June 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Richard Eugene Betron, Jr, P.O. Box 97, Twining, MI 48766 ; and Betron Enterprises, Inc., c/o Richard Eugene Betron, Jr., P.O. Box 97, Twining, MI 48766 (Sandusky, K)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DEFAULT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Richard Eugene Betron, Jr, Betron Enterprises, Inc. (DPer)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Petrojebla, SA de CV (Falkenstein, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Falkenstein, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Falkenstein, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Petrojebla, SA de CV served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Falkenstein, Peter)[CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS FOR Betron Enterprises, Inc. ] Modified on 5/22/2019 (NAhm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. McDaniel on behalf of Petrojebla, SA de CV. (McDaniel, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Betron LP Gas, Inc.* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Betron Enterprises, Inc.* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Richard Eugene Betron, Jr* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Petrojebla, SA de CV against Richard Eugene Betron, Jr, Betron Enterprises, Inc., Betron LP Gas, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7241451 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Aranac - County of 1st Defendant: Aranac. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Contract dated 6-28-17, #3 Exhibit 2-Wire transfer receipt 10-17-17, #4 Exhibit 3-Wire transfer receipt 10-18-17, #5 Exhibit 4-Spreadsheet of payments and deliveries, #6 Exhibit 5-Demand letter to Defendants dated 11-8-18, #7 Exhibit 6-Betron LP Gas, Inc. corporate summary) (Falkenstein, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrojebla, SA de CV v. Betron Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Eugene Betron, Jr
Represented By: David L. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betron Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betron LP Gas, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrojebla, SA de CV
Represented By: Peter M. Falkenstein
Represented By: David S. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?