Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Global Contaiment Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Michigan Laborers' Annuity Fund, Michigan Laborers' Health Care Fund, Michigan Laborers' District Council of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund, Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund and Michigan Laborers' Training and Apprenticeship Fund
Defendant: Global Containment Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12155
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) Modified on 4/24/2020 (JCur).
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Global Containment Solutions, LLC (Allard, Mark)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/12/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/5/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2021 01:30 PM; Bench Trial set for 4/27/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Allard, Mark)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER extending time to file revised discovery plan by 1/24/2020 and suspending all pending dates listed in the 12/16/2019 Scheduling Order #15 . Parties are working on trying to resolved this matter. Entered by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2019; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/11/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 01:30 PM; Bench Trial set for 9/8/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 [STRICKEN] ENTERED ON WRONG CASE NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 11/25/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (MVer) Modified on 11/6/2019 (MVer).
November 6, 2019 NOTICE of Error re #14 Notice to Appear. Docket entry was made on the wrong case. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (MVer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Crummel, Lauren)
October 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN (JCur)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Patrick Konwinski on behalf of Global Containment Solutions, LLC. (Konwinski, Kyle)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Global Containment Solutions, LLC (Allard, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Allard on behalf of Global Containment Solutions, LLC. (Allard, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Global Containment Solutions, LLC. (Allard, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Crummel, Lauren)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Detroit to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (SSch)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Global Containment Solutions, LLC* (SKra)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Megan B. Boelstler appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boelstler, Megan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher P. Legghio appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Legghio, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Crummel, Lauren)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Global Containment Solutions, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7334143 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Waukesha, WI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - CBA and GCS Signature Page, #3 Exhibit 2 - Trust Agreements and Amendments, #4 Exhibit 3 - Laborers' Collection Policy, #5 Exhibit 4 - Audit Demand Letter to GCS) (Crummel, Lauren)
July 23, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Global Contaiment Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' Annuity Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' Health Care Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' District Council of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Laborers' Training and Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Lauren E. Crummel
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Containment Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Represented By: Mark S. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?