Harrison v. Michigan Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Kenneth Richard Harrison
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv12729
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Adopting #7 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 2, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Richard Harrison, #6 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Kenneth Richard Harrison at 7116 S. Straits Hwy, Indian River, MI 49749. (KCas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Richard Harrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring All Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kenneth Richard Harrison. (NAhm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Richard Harrison against Michigan Department of Corrections (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Richard Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?