Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier, John Andrade, Laura Huizar, Rafael Ceja, Richard Dyer, Willis Hayes, Orlando Ibarra, Holly Ellis, Erasmo Garcia, Raed Ari, David Bell, Nick Brannon, Dan Breckenridge, Frank Marshall, Mark Doty, Solomon Aleka, Martin Mahmoudi, Daniel Braun, Jose Huizar, Jim Gill, Linda Hayes, Patricia Belk, Marcos Cobian, Luis Lopez, Frank Belk, Chad Hughes, Francisco Delacruz, Kyle Krall, Scott Kidd, Calvin Ciapponi, Thaddeus Dykier, Mark Bunker, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Brent Lehr, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Alfonso Hernandez, Casey Dean, Dale Hale, Amos Gates, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Ron Lake, David Fee, Elaine Marshall, Larry Capatosto, Robert Ellington, Linda Brubaker, Franklin Kempner, Jon Aleka, Andy Fok, Michael Hosford, Victor Davis, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mauro Lopez, Jose Acevedo, Janine Lehr, Dudley Baker, Ruben Hurtado, Dan Klatt, Bill Brubaker, Stanley Bronstrup, Jerry Kenny, Dustin Coyner, Kip Holbrook, Michael Blankenship, Ryan Berry, Robert Garitano, Robert Brenier, Mike Lapier, Gerando Barron, Meridith Holloway, Mayra Hernandez, Darrell Anderson, Matt Manna, Daniel Duffy, Alex Llamas, Kevin Harms, Jon Barnhart, Idovino Artifon, Billy Duckworth and Mike Bulaon
Defendant: Courtesy Chevrolet Center, General Motors LLC, Paradise Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv13220
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
2 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Remand to California State Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Remand to California State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities) (Miller, Charles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand to California State Court filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Unpublished Authorities) (Smith, Renee)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Sheppard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sheppard, Richard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William R. Jansen appearing on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Jansen, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Robert Bosch LLC (Lauderbach, Jonathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Abena Ayowa Mainoo on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC. (Mainoo, Abena)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Slater on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC. (Slater, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E. Lauderbach on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC. (Lauderbach, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to California State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum) (Miller, Charles)
November 1, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Central District of California. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07343.
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 31 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND 30 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Transfer Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. The Remand Motion remains pending, to be determined by the Eastern District of Michigan. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 11/1/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, Los Angeles County, case number 19CHCV00572 Receipt No: 0973-24316799 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket) (Attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow added to party General Motors LLC(pty:bkmov))(Bladow, Robyn) [Transferred from California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07343.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrade
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Huizar
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceja
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dyer
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Hayes
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Ibarra
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ellis
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erasmo Garcia
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raed Ari
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bell
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Brannon
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Breckenridge
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marshall
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Doty
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Aleka
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Mahmoudi
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Braun
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Huizar
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Gill
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hayes
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Belk
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Cobian
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lopez
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Belk
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hughes
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Delacruz
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Krall
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kidd
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ciapponi
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Dykier
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bunker
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Lehr
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kehoe
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Dean
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hale
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Gates
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Allen
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Einhaus
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Lake
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fee
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Marshall
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Capatosto
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellington
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brubaker
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Kempner
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Aleka
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Fok
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hosford
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Davis
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Graham
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gurtovoy
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aukes
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Curley
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Lopez
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acevedo
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Lehr
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Baker
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Hurtado
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Klatt
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brubaker
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Bronstrup
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kenny
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Coyner
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Holbrook
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blankenship
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Berry
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garitano
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brenier
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Lapier
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerando Barron
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridith Holloway
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Hernandez
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Anderson
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Manna
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Duffy
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Llamas
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harms
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Barnhart
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idovino Artifon
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Duckworth
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bulaon
Represented By: Edward E. Angwin
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Represented By: Richard C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy Chevrolet Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Renee D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr.
Represented By: Abena Ayowa Mainoo
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lauderbach
Represented By: William R. Jansen
Represented By: Matthew D. Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?