Woloshik v. The Dow Chemical Company
Plaintiff: Jeanne Woloshik
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10402
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/13/2020; Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/13/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Margaret C. Stalker appearing on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Stalker, Margaret)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Fielder on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Fielder, Amanda)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 4/13/2020.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Dow Chemical Company (Bardelli, Edward)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (Reliance Upon) by The Dow Chemical Company. (Bardelli, Edward)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin L. Kula appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kula, Kevin)
February 18, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The Dow Chemical Company* (LHos)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7604362 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Midland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mastromarco, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woloshik v. The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Amanda M. Fielder
Represented By: Margaret C. Stalker
Represented By: Edward J. Bardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Woloshik
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin L. Kula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?