Inspired Concepts, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London and Underwriters Known as Syndicate 2623 et al
Plaintiff: Inspired Concepts, LLC and KJ Endeavors, LLC
Defendant: Syndicate 1967, Syndicate 0510, Syndicate 2988, Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London and Underwriters Known as Syndicate 2623, Syndicate 2791, Syndicate 2488, Syndicate 0727, Syndicate 0609, Syndicate 1084, Syndicate 1183, Syndicate 1686, Syndicate 0435, Syndicate 0623, Syndicate 2001, Syndicate 2987, Syndicate 1729 and Syndicate 4141
Case Number: 1:2020cv11516
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Inspired Concepts, LLC, KJ Endeavors, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pr. 41(a)(1)(i) without Predjudice (Grunfeld, Kenneth)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond re #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 8/7/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sean P. McNally appearing on behalf of Inspired Concepts, LLC, KJ Endeavors, LLC (McNally, Sean)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Inspired Concepts, LLC, KJ Endeavors, LLC of Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Grunfeld, Kenneth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Grunfeld on behalf of Inspired Concepts, LLC, KJ Endeavors, LLC. (Grunfeld, Kenneth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Green, Jonathan)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause why this Action should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2020. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London and Underwriters Known as Syndicate 2623, Syndicate 0435, Syndicate 0510, Syndicate 0609, Syndicate 0623, Syndicate 0727, Syndicate 1084, Syndicate 1183, Syndicate 1686, Syndicate 1729, Syndicate 1967, Syndicate 2001, Syndicate 2488, Syndicate 2791, Syndicate 2987, Syndicate 2988, Syndicate 4141* (SKra)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by KJ Endeavors, LLC, Inspired Concepts, LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7856140 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Isabella - County Where Action Arose: Isabella - County of 1st Defendant: Foreign. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Green, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inspired Concepts, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London and Underwriters Known as Syndicate 2623 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 1967
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 0510
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 2988
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London and Underwriters Known as Syndicate 2623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 2791
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 2488
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 0727
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 0609
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 1084
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 1183
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 1686
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 0435
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 0623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 2001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 2987
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 1729
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate 4141
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inspired Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ Endeavors, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?