Williams v. Saul
Plaintiff: Deborah Williams
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv12226
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Nagelberg on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Nagelberg, James)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Andrew Saul* (NAhm)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (TTho)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Deborah Williams. (Riggs, Erika)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Williams against Andrew Saul. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Riggs, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: James J. Nagelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Williams
Represented By: Erika Ann Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?