French v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Randy French
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, CR Bard Inc, Does 1 - 100 and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv12233
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to stay (for 90 days). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss co-defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to FRCP 21, (Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2020). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss co-defendant McKesson Corporation pursuant to FRCP 21 by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for CR Bard Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Mitchell on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc. (Mitchell, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Taylor Tapley Daly appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc (Daly, Taylor)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sanjay Ghosh appearing on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Inc (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Northern District of Texas. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02191.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 21 Motion To Sever And Transfer Venue Of Out-Of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Randy French's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2191); b. Plaintiff Catherine Grant's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2192); c. Plaintiff Shihee Hatchett's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2193); d. Plaintiff Karen Husky's case be severed and transferred to the Knoxville Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2194); e. Plaintiff James Johnson's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2195); f. Plaintiff Coretha McCray's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2196); g. Plaintiff Orion Christy's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2197); h. Plaintiff Alice Pawelczyk's case is to be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division for the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2198); i. Plaintiff Pamela Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil Case: 3:20-cv-2199). Plaintiff Dennis Grant is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (mjr)[Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896653) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Mckesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/8/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02191.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy French
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?