Midland Technical Carbon, LLC v. Boyce Hydro Power LLC et al
Plaintiff: Midland Technical Carbon, LLC
Defendant: Lee W. Mueller, Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes & Energy, Mark C Bone, Boyce Hydro Power LLC, Boyce Michigan LLC, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Bailey Agency Inc, Boyce Hydro LLC and John 1-100 Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv12279
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Webber, Christopher)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Explain Why This Case Should Not Be Consolidated. Response due by 10/15/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Webber, Christopher)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Webber, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher S.C. Webber appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Webber, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause Why This Case Should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Attorney Webber to File an Appearance. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant John 1-100 Doe. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Bagley, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Bailey Agency Inc, Mark C Bone, Boyce Hydro LLC, Boyce Hydro Power LLC, Boyce Michigan LLC, Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes & Energy, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Lee W. Mueller* (SKra)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8002024 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland County - County Where Action Arose: Midland County - County of 1st Defendant: Midland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bagley, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland Technical Carbon, LLC v. Boyce Hydro Power LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee W. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes & Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyce Hydro Power LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyce Michigan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Natural Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyce Hydro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-100 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland Technical Carbon, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Bagley
Represented By: Christopher S.C. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?