DOE v. Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority and CHRISTINE M SMITH
Case Number: 1:2020cv12997
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 by Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority. (Gostek, Katharine)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority. (Gostek, Katharine)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by CHRISTINE M SMITH. (Stewart, Lauri)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Smith Consent Order) (Kelly, Kevin)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2021 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority. (Gostek, Katharine)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauri B. Stewart on behalf of CHRISTINE M SMITH. (Stewart, Lauri)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Tamm on behalf of CHRISTINE M SMITH. (Tamm, James)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Protective Order to Proceed Pseudonymously. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *CHRISTINE M SMITH* (NAhm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority* (NAhm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order FOR PERMISSION TO PRECEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY by All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Kevin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8151255 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ogemaw - County Where Action Arose: Ogemaw - County of 1st Defendant: Crawford. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kelly, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Lakes Community Mental Health Authority
Represented By: Katharine Gostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE M SMITH
Represented By: James E. Tamm
Represented By: Lauri B. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Kevin J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?