Reed v. Presque Isle County et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Reed
Defendant: Luke Ryan, Presque Isle County and Kenneth Radzibon
Case Number: 1:2021cv11112
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Kyle Reed. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements to be Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders due by 7/16/2021.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #3 , #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (Reliance Upon) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Reliance Upon Jury Demand) (Wierda, Bradley)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kyle Reed. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Wierda, Bradley)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kyle Reed. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D. Wierda on behalf of All Defendants. (Wierda, Bradley)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth Radzibon served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Luke Ryan served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Presque Isle County served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Dunn, Celeste)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kyle Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Dunn, Celeste)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyle Reed against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8465170 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Presque Isle - County Where Action Arose: Presque Isle - County of 1st Defendant: Presque Isle. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Dunn, Celeste)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Kyle Reed. Reason: Plaintiff added. (Dunn, Celeste)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Presque Isle County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Ryan
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presque Isle County
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Radzibon
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Reed
Represented By: Celeste M. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?