Castanon v. United Parcel Service, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Castanon
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc and Robert Rankin
Case Number: 1:2022cv11679
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Opinion and Order Directing Defendants to Pay #14 Attorney's Fees and Costs to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Attorney's Fees by Matthew Castanon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rikki Mays-Reak's Declaration) (Mays-Reak, Rikki)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Robert Rankin, United Parcel Service, Inc re #10 Order Remanding Case : Brief of Defendants Regarding Attorney's Fees. (Lange, Erik)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE remanding case to 10TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, SAGINAW COUNTY. (DPer)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (DPer)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE to 10th Circuit Court of Saginaw County. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (DPer)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Robert Rankin, United Parcel Service, Inc re #8 Notice (Other) : Notice of Supplement to Brief Supporting Federal Jurisdiction and the Timeliness of the Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Unpublished Opinions) (Lange, Erik)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by All Defendants re #6 Order to Show Cause Filing of Brief in Response to Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Unpublished Opinions) (Lange, Erik)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 [PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE] MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Matthew Castanon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Attorney Appearances) (Mays-Reak, Rikki) Modified on 8/22/2022 (KWin).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Parties to Show Cause for Why the Case Should Not be Remanded for Untimely Removal. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2022. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Long-Daniels on behalf of Robert Rankin, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Long-Daniels, David)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Ramson on behalf of Robert Rankin, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Ramson, Angela)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses : Amended Answer and Defenses to First Amended Complaint by Robert Rankin, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Lange, Erik)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error re Notice of Error, Error Notice by Clerk's Office on 7/22/2022, was Issued in Error and will be Stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KWin)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by United Parcel Service, Inc identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. Delaware for United Parcel Service, Inc. (Lange, Erik)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Tenth Judicial Circuit Court for the County of Saginaw, Michigan, case number 21-44780-CD. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8988809 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 1:21-cv-11942-TLL-PTM, Judge Hon. Thomas L. Ludington] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court-First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court-Notice of Service of Process on UPS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court-Plaintiff's Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court-Local 406 Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Remand to State Court, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Certified Copy of Castanon Deposition, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Certified Copy of Rankin Deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Declaration of Kelly Johnson, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Declaration of Robert Rankin, #11 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Lange, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castanon v. United Parcel Service, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Castanon
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Rikki Mechelle Mays-Reak, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc
Represented By: Erik D. Lange
Represented By: Angela Ramson
Represented By: David W. Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rankin
Represented By: Erik D. Lange
Represented By: Angela Ramson
Represented By: David W. Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?