Zlatkin et al v. Butman, Township of et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Rose Zlatkin and Peggy Zlatkin
Defendant: Butman, Township of, Gladwin, County of, Joshua M. Farrell, Elizabeth M. Post, Steven Worpel, Robert Lee, Justin Ronald Henderson, James Maveal, Jr., Aaron Miller, Norman E. Gace, Vicki Sue Chickering, Gina Coon, Rebecca Kreisher and Karen Moore
Case Number: 1:2023cv12693
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Koerner on behalf of Butman, Township of. (Koerner, Mark)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED #9 Answer to Complaint by Gina Coon, Joshua M. Farrell, Norman E. Gace, Gladwin, County of, James Maveal, Jr, Aaron Miller, Karen Moore, Elizabeth M. Post, Steven Worpel Defendants First Amended Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service (Kazim, Haider)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Answer to Complaint by Butman, Township of (Meagher, Thomas)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Marshal Service on Remaining Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
November 27, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion on All Plaintiffs at 2699 Dutcher Road, Gladwin, MI 48624. (KCas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and Proof of Service by Gina Coon, Joshua M. Farrell, Norman E. Gace, Gladwin, County of, James Maveal, Jr, Aaron Miller, Karen Moore, Elizabeth M. Post, Steven Worpel. (Kazim, Haider)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Butman, Township of. (Meagher, Thomas)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Haider A. Kazim on behalf of Gina Coon, Joshua M. Farrell, Norman E. Gace, Gladwin, County of, James Maveal, Jr, Aaron Miller, Karen Moore, Elizabeth M. Post, Steven Worpel. (Kazim, Haider)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Marshal service on remaining defendants by Peggy Zlatkin. (SSch)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Butman, Township of served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Gina Coon served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Joshua M. Farrell served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Norman E. Gace served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Gladwin, County of served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; James Maveal, Jr served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Aaron Miller served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Karen Moore served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Steven Worpel served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. Robert Lee, Justin Henderson, and Elizabeth Post returned as undeliverable. (SSch)
November 15, 2023 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Peggy Zlatkin - Receipt No. 150007928 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (Grew, Jennifer)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
October 26, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on both Plaintiffs to Peggy Zlatkin, 2699 Dutcher Road, Gladwin, MI 48624, and Sharon Rose Zlatkin, 2699 Dutcher Road, Gladwin, MI 48624. (KWin)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * [Provided to plaintiff in person] (NAhm)
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants Receipt No: Pending in Financial - Fee: $ 402. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zlatkin et al v. Butman, Township of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Rose Zlatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Zlatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butman, Township of
Represented By: Mark T. Koerner
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladwin, County of
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua M. Farrell
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Post
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Worpel
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Ronald Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Maveal, Jr.
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Miller
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman E. Gace
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Sue Chickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Coon
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Kreisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Moore
Represented By: Haider A. Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?